This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:17:21 (UTC).

Mungamuri v. Choate

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Mungamuri filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Choate. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine D. Perry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02393

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine D. Perry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hannah Mungamuri

St. Louis, MO 63126

Defendant

Gail Choate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Andrea Staci Alper

Attorney at ST. LOUIS COUNTY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE

41 S. Central Avenue

Clayton, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Hannah Mungamuri Process Server: United States Marshals Service (MFG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #1 Summons) (MFG). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Gail Choate. (Alper, Andrea) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrea Staci Alper for Defendant Gail Choate. (Alper, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#7

(#7) PRO SE RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Hannah Mungamuri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TMT) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants 1 Summons(es) issued, Jury Demand,, filed by Hannah Mungamuri. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFG) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRO SE RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Hannah Mungamuri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TMT) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Gail Choate. (Alper, Andrea) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Duplicate document removed; filed in error Motion to Dismiss and Suggestions in Support ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gail Choate.(Alper, Andrea) Modified on 10/7/2019 (TMT). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrea Staci Alper for Defendant Gail Choate. (Alper, Andrea) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Hannah Mungamuri. Gail Choate served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Receipt 4644082078 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Hannah Mungamuri (CCAM) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Aug 22 17:01:04 CDT 2019 (admin,) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was hand delivered to Hannah Mungamuri. Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Hannah Mungamuri Process Server: United States Marshals Service (MFG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2019: #1 Summons) (MFG). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants 1 Summons(es) issued, Jury Demand,, filed by Hannah Mungamuri. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFG) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.