This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:01:03 (UTC).

Mumma v. Slobodian

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Mumma filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Slobodian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01983

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Appellant

Robert M Mumma, II

Grantham, PA 17027

Appellees and Trustees

Markian R. Slobodian

Camp Hill, PA 17001

U.S. Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee Attorneys

Markian R. Slobodian

Attorney at Law Offices of Markian R. Slobodian

P. O. Box 480

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Gregory Benjamin Schiller

Attorney at US Department of Jutice

228 Walnut Street, 11Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION for Reconsideration of #8 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert M Mumma, II.(eo) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/22/2021 (ve) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

3 #20

Proposed Order

3 #19

Exhibit R

3 #18

Exhibit Q

3 #17

Exhibit P

3 #16

Exhibit O

3 #15

Exhibit N

3 #14

Exhibit M

3 #13

Exhibit L

3 #12

Exhibit K

3 #10

Exhibit I

3 #7

Exhibit F

3 #6

Exhibit E

3 #4

Exhibit C

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Certificate of Nonconcurrence

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely and for Failure to Comply with Banruptcy Rules by Markian R. Slobodian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Proposed Order)(Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Reconsideration of #8 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert M Mumma, II.(eo) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/22/2021 (ve) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXHIBIT L (Amended) filed by Markian R. Slobodian re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely and for Failure to Comply with Banruptcy Rules. (Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXHIBIT K (Amended) filed by Markian R. Slobodian re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely and for Failure to Comply with Banruptcy Rules. (Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXHIBIT J (Amended) filed by Markian R. Slobodian re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely and for Failure to Comply with Banruptcy Rules. (Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely and for Failure to Comply with Banruptcy Rules filed by Markian R. Slobodian. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely and for Failure to Comply with Banruptcy Rules by Markian R. Slobodian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Proposed Order)(Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order sustaining Objection to Claims 26 and 31 (pr) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-1334. Bankruptcy Judge Presiding Over Bankruptcy Case Henry W. VanEck. File received (pr) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Markian R. Slobodian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Benjamin Schiller(Designation Retained)