This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:58:25 (UTC).

Mumma v. Double M Real Estate, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Mumma filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Double M Real Estate, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sylvia H. Rambo and Jennifer P. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sylvia H. Rambo

Jennifer P. Wilson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Robert M Mumma, II

Grantham, PA 17027

Respondents

Pennsy Supply, Inc.

Double M Real Estate, LLC

Trustees

Markian R. Slobodian

Harrisburg, PA 17102

U.S. Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Matthew Myers Haar

Attorney at Saul Ewing LLP

Two N. Second Street, 7Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Lawrence V. Young

Attorney at CGA Law Firm

135 North George Street

York, PA 17011

Trustee Attorneys

Markian R. Slobodian

Attorney at Law Offices of Markian R. Slobodian

801 N. 2Nd Street

Harrisburg, PA 17102

Gregory Benjamin Schiller

Attorney at US Department of Jutice

228 Walnut Street, 11Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to withdraw the reference filed by Movant Robert M. Mumma, II (Doc. 1) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is accordingly directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/31/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 6, 2020, Appellant Robert M. Mumma, II shall notify the court and opposing counsel as to his election to either retain represented counsel or proceed in the above captioned matters as an unrepresented litigant. Mr. Mumma may make such an election by filing a letter on the dockets of the above captioned matters. If Mr. Mumma fails to file such an election by the above deadline, the court will construe his silence as an election to proceed as an unrepresented litigant. There will be no extensions of the above deadline. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/24/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #1 Withdraw the Reference. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/31/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ELECTION to retain represented counsel filed by Robert M Mumma, II re #5 Order. (mfa) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/27/2020 (ve) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) #7 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) filed by Robert M Mumma, II.(mfa) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

1 #1

District Court Docket

#3

(#3) OBJECTIONS by Markian R. Slobodian. to #1 Withdraw the Reference . (Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) OBJECTIONS by Double M Real Estate, LLC. to #1 Withdraw the Reference . (Young, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a case status conference is scheduled for February 19, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be by telephone. Counsel for Appellee Double M Development shall initiate the call by calling chambers at (717) 221-3970 after all parties are on the line. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/24/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE Bankruptcy Court case number 1:17-bk-01334 HWV. Bankruptcy Judge Presiding Over Bankruptcy Case Judge Henry Van Eck. (Attachments: #1 District Court Docket)(BK Court W-B 1, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/9/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER denying #10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/27/2020 (ve) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) #7 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) filed by Robert M Mumma, II.(mfa) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ELECTION to retain represented counsel filed by Robert M Mumma, II re #5 Order. (mfa) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to withdraw the reference filed by Movant Robert M. Mumma, II (Doc. 1) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is accordingly directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/31/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #1 Withdraw the Reference. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/31/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a case status conference is scheduled for February 19, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The conference will be by telephone. Counsel for Appellee Double M Development shall initiate the call by calling chambers at (717) 221-3970 after all parties are on the line. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/24/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that no later than 5:00 p.m. on February 6, 2020, Appellant Robert M. Mumma, II shall notify the court and opposing counsel as to his election to either retain represented counsel or proceed in the above captioned matters as an unrepresented litigant. Mr. Mumma may make such an election by filing a letter on the dockets of the above captioned matters. If Mr. Mumma fails to file such an election by the above deadline, the court will construe his silence as an election to proceed as an unrepresented litigant. There will be no extensions of the above deadline. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/24/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OBJECTIONS by Double M Real Estate, LLC. to #1 Withdraw the Reference . (Young, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) OBJECTIONS by Markian R. Slobodian. to #1 Withdraw the Reference . (Slobodian, Markian) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/9/2020. (ve) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been reassigned to Judge Wilson. (mfa) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been reassigned to Judge Kane. (mfa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE Bankruptcy Court case number 1:17-bk-01334 HWV. Bankruptcy Judge Presiding Over Bankruptcy Case Judge Henry Van Eck. (Attachments: #1 District Court Docket)(BK Court W-B 1, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.