Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 07:45:20 (UTC).

Muminov v. Judd Transportation LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Muminov filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Judd Transportation LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ortrie D. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ortrie D. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Almazbek Muminov

Defendants

Judd Transportation LLC

Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC

XPO Logistics Express LLC

Swift Leasing Co LLC

Wilbur Walker

Julius Kamara

Julius S Kamara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Trivett Thompson

Attorney at Edelman & Thompson LLC

3100 Broadway, Suite 1400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Elizabeth Legacie Van Erem

Attorney at Edelman & Thompson

3100 Broadway, Ste. 1400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorneys

William Patrick Denning

Attorney at Sanders Warren Russell & Scheer LLP-OPKS

40 Corporate Woods, 9401 Indian Creek Parkway, Suite 1250

Overland Park, KS 66210

Matthew J. Brooker

Attorney at Matteuzzi & Brooker, P.C.

10111 W. 105Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 9/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. Signed on 7/1/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#11

(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. XPO Logistics Express LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Swift Leasing Co LLC, Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Wilbur Walker.(Attorney Matthew J. Brooker added to party Swift Leasing Co LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Brooker added to party Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Brooker added to party Wilbur Walker(pty:dft))(Brooker, Matthew) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#9

(#9) RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 6/24/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#8

(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 8/8/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/22/2019. Corporate disclosures due by 7/9/2019. Signed on 6/24/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Joint and Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Judd Transportation LLC, Julius S Kamara, XPO Logistics Express LLC.(Attorney William Patrick Denning added to party Judd Transportation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Patrick Denning added to party Julius S Kamara(pty:dft), Attorney William Patrick Denning added to party XPO Logistics Express LLC(pty:dft))(Denning, William) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Judd Transportation LLC served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Wilbur Walker served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Swift Leasing Co LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James Trivett Thompson on behalf of Almazbek Muminov. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6317961. Service due by 8/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 9/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City (JTM) before Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. Signed on 7/1/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. XPO Logistics Express LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Swift Leasing Co LLC, Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC, Wilbur Walker.(Attorney Matthew J. Brooker added to party Swift Leasing Co LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Brooker added to party Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Brooker added to party Wilbur Walker(pty:dft))(Brooker, Matthew) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 6/24/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 8/8/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/22/2019. Corporate disclosures due by 7/9/2019. Signed on 6/24/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint and Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Judd Transportation LLC, Julius S Kamara, XPO Logistics Express LLC.(Attorney William Patrick Denning added to party Judd Transportation LLC(pty:dft), Attorney William Patrick Denning added to party Julius S Kamara(pty:dft), Attorney William Patrick Denning added to party XPO Logistics Express LLC(pty:dft))(Denning, William) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Judd Transportation LLC served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Wilbur Walker served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Swift Leasing Co LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Almazbek Muminov. Swift Transportation Co of Arizona, LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James Trivett Thompson on behalf of Almazbek Muminov. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6317961. Service due by 8/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, James) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWIFT LEASING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XPO Logistics, Inc. is a litigant