This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2021 at 10:03:44 (UTC).

Muminov v. Jaddou et. al,

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Muminov filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Jaddou . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James S. Gwin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01637

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Gwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mirrakhmat Muminov

Defendants

UR Mendoza JADDOU

CONNIE NOLAN

Debra Rogers

Director of USCIS

Acting Associate Director of the Service Center Operations Directorate of USCIS

Director of the USCIS Potomac Service Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer E. Nimer

Attorney at Nimer Law

6555 Longshore Street

Dublin, OH 43017

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Hammond Johnson

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Rema A. Ina

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order of Case Dismissal signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/28/2021. re #4 (S,KM) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(i) filed by Mirrakhmat Muminov. (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Appearance by Rema A. Ina and Lisa Hammond Johnson filed by on behalf of Acting Associate Director of the Service Center Operations Directorate of USCIS, Director of USCIS, Director of the USCIS Potomac Service Center. (Ina, Rema) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Counsel for service upon All Defendants, United States Attorney General and United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,Ja) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,Ja) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketJudge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,Ja) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402.00 Receipt number AOHNDC-10997083. Filed by Mirrakhmat Muminov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 7/18/2021 Letter, #2 Exhibit B,Case Processing Times #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Nimer, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director of USCIS Lee Francis cissna is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rema A Ina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Hammond Johnson