This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2019 at 08:04:30 (UTC).

Mumin

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Mumin was filed as a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Richard G. Kopf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Kopf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dukhan Mumin

Tecumseh, NE 68450-0900

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's Memorandum and Order granting Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP (filing no. #7 ) is vacated as it was entered in error. Plaintiff has 30 days to either show cause for why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 8, 2019: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) *VACATED* ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $.03 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 8, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO) Modified on 6/6/2019 to vacate per memorandum and order #8 (LKO). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#10

(#10) JUDGMENT - This case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the corresponding Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#5

(#5) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy mailed to Bruce Hunzeker at Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #2 ) is denied. This case is dismissed without prejudice and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

10 #1

Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JUDGMENT - This case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the corresponding Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #2 ) is denied. This case is dismissed without prejudice and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's Memorandum and Order granting Plaintiff leave to proceed IFP (filing no. #7 ) is vacated as it was entered in error. Plaintiff has 30 days to either show cause for why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: July 8, 2019: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) *VACATED* ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $.03 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 8, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and plaintiff's institution)(LKO) Modified on 6/6/2019 to vacate per memorandum and order #8 (LKO). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Copy mailed to Bruce Hunzeker at Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LKO) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less