3:20-CV-07674
10/30/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange
William Alsup
Steven A. Mullen
C. Allen Parker
John R. Shrewsberry
Wells Fargo & Company
Timothy J. Sloan
Shawn A. Williams
Brian Edward Cochran
Robert Moss Tiefenbrun
John C. Tang
Nanci L. Clarence
Josh Alan Cohen
Adam F. Shearer
Civil Cover Sheet
Docket(#25) ORDER re #22 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by C. Allen Parker, John R. Shrewsberry, Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/22/2020. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup to be held in conjunction with related case 20-cv-7997. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/22/2020. (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#22) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by John C. Tang (Tang, John) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Moss Tiefenbrun (Tiefenbrun, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Tang (Tang, John) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#19) NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROTOCOL FOR INTERVIEWING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#18) ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#17) ORDER RE STIPULATED REQUEST #15 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by Timothy J. Sloan (Shearer, Adam) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Timothy J. Sloan on 11/02/2020, filed by Steven A. Mullen. (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John R. Shrewsberry on 11/03/2020, filed by Steven A. Mullen. (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on C. Allen Parker on 11/16/2020, filed by Steven A. Mullen. (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wells Fargo & Company on 11/02/2020, filed by Steven A. Mullen. (Cochran, Brian) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) Summons Issued as to C. Allen Parker, John R. Shrewsberry, Timothy J. Sloan, and Wells Fargo & Company. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven A. Mullen (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against C. Allen Parker, John R. Shrewsberry, Timothy J. Sloan, Wells Fargo & Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15136908.). Filed bySteven A. Mullen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/30/2020) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
[-] Read Less