This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:15:25 (UTC).

MULLEN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by MULLEN against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17087

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA A. MULLEN

Defendant

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl Osterhout. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl Osterhout by PATRICIA A. MULLEN. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Applicant, #2 Exhibit A-CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #3 Exhibit B-SUPPLEMENTAL LIST OF COURT ADMISSIONS, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(ELLIS, MARYJEAN) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson added. (abr) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ELLIS, MARYJEAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.