This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 08:19:04 (UTC).

Mulalley et al v. Starbucks Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Mulalley filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Starbucks Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gonzalo P. Curiel and Daniel E. Butcher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gonzalo P. Curiel

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sarah T. Bekele

Sabrina D. Edwards

Ashley Mulalley

Defendants

Starbucks Coffee Company

Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee Company

Sharee Huddleston

Starbucks Corporation

Does 1 Through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Miller

Attorney at Law Office of David A Miller

555 West Beech Street, Suite 413

San Diego, CA 92101

David A. Miller

Attorney at Law Office of David A. Miller

555 West Beech Street, Suite 451

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Rachael S. Lavi

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2049 Century Park East, 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Noah Jacob Woods

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

501 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance of Rachael Lavi by Rachael S. Lavi on behalf of Sharee Huddleston, Starbucks Corporation (Lavi, Rachael)Attorney Rachael S. Lavi added to party Sharee Huddleston(pty:dft), Attorney Rachael S. Lavi added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rachael S. Lavi added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule - re Plaintiffs filed a Motion to Remand #8 : Any opposition shall be filed on or before February 18, 2021. Any reply shall be filed on or before February 25, 2021. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for March 12, 2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Re #5 , #6 : The March 5, 2021 hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration shall continue to March 12, 2021 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/5/21.(dlg) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 #6 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Compel Arbitration. Any opposition shall be filed on or before February 5, 2021. Any reply shall be filed on or before February 12, 2021. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for March 5, 2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/19/21.(dlg) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Starbucks Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, and Corporate Disclosure Statement. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Julie Broxson by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#2

(#2) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Racael S. Lavi by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15182627.), filed by Starbucks Coffee Company, Starbucks Corporation, Sharee Huddleston, Does 1 Through 10. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:21-cv-32-GPC-DEB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Defendant's Objections to the Declaration of David A. Miller Filed in Supportof Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand)(Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss this Action or Stay Proceedings filed by Sharee Huddleston, Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Noah J. Woods in Support of Defendants' Reply to their Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss this Action or Stay Proceedings)(Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance of Rachael Lavi by Rachael S. Lavi on behalf of Sharee Huddleston, Starbucks Corporation (Lavi, Rachael)Attorney Rachael S. Lavi added to party Sharee Huddleston(pty:dft), Attorney Rachael S. Lavi added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Rachael S. Lavi added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft) (jmr). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NON Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff Sarah T. Bekele's Second and Fourth Causes of Action filed by Sarah T. Bekele. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Miller, David) (dlg). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss this Action or Stay Proceedings filed by Ashley Mulalley. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Miller, David) (dlg). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule - re Plaintiffs filed a Motion to Remand #8 : Any opposition shall be filed on or before February 18, 2021. Any reply shall be filed on or before February 25, 2021. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for March 12, 2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Re #5 , #6 : The March 5, 2021 hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration shall continue to March 12, 2021 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/5/21.(dlg) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ashley Mulalley. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Miller, David) (dlg). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 #6 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Compel Arbitration. Any opposition shall be filed on or before February 5, 2021. Any reply shall be filed on or before February 12, 2021. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for March 5, 2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/19/21.(dlg) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss this Action or Stay Proceedings by Sharee Huddleston, Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants Starbucks Corporation and Sharee Huddleston's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss this Action or Stay Proceedings, #2 Declaration Declaration of Noah J. Woods in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss this Action or Stay Proceedings, #3 Declaration Declaration of Kathryn Daly in Support of Starbucks Corporation and Sharee Huddleston's Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff Sarah T. Bekele's Second and Fourth Causes of Action by Sharee Huddleston, Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Defendant Sharee Huddleston's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Sarah T. Bekele, #2 Declaration Declaration of Noah J. Woods in Support of Sharee Huddleston's Motion to Dismiss Claims of Plaintiff Sarah T. Bekele)(Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Starbucks Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, and Corporate Disclosure Statement. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Julie Broxson by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Racael S. Lavi by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Woods, Noah) (dlg). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15182627.), filed by Starbucks Coffee Company, Starbucks Corporation, Sharee Huddleston, Does 1 Through 10. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:21-cv-32-GPC-DEB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starbucks Corporation doing business as Starbucks Coffee Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Starbucks Coffee Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Miller(Designation Retained)