This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2020 at 08:23:55 (UTC).

Mujae Group, Inc. v. Spotify USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Mujae Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Spotify USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin K. Hellerstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06719

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mujae Group, Inc. doing business as VoxTonePRO

Defendants

Spotify AB

Spotify USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Juanita R. Brooks

Kelly A Del Dotto

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Michael T. Zoppo

Kayleigh E. McGlynn

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. (MA)

One Marina Park Drive

Boston, MA 02110

Lawrence K. Kolodney

Michael Theodore Zoppo

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

7 Times Square, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Cheryl Wang

12860 El Camino Real, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

Susan E. Morrison

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, P.C.

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 1114

Wilmington, DE 19899-1114

Esha Bandyopadhyay

500 Arguello Street, Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

Lawrence Kenneth Kolodney

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. (DE)

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DC 19801

Excylyn Janaize Hardin-Smith

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

7 Times Square, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Juanita Rose Brooks

Attorney at Fish & Richardson

12860 El Camino Real, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant Attorneys

Dana Kathryn Severance

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher Donati

Kristen Healey Cramer

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Roy P. Salins

Lacy H. Koonce, III

Roy Pinchus Salins

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (NYC)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Lacy Herman Koonce, III

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP (NYC)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#51

#50

#49

#48

#47

46 #3

Text of Proposed Order

46 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

#46

#40

7 #2

Summons

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Spotify AB, Spotify USA Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER granting #49 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #40 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6). So Ordered Replies due by 9/22/2020. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/17/2020) (js) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lacy H. Koonce, III dated 9/17/2020. Document filed by Spotify AB, Spotify USA Inc...(Koonce, Lacy) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #40 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Mujae Group, Inc...(Zoppo, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF KAYLEIGH E. MCGLYNN granting #46 Motion for Kayleigh E. McGlynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Kayleigh E. McGlynn, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above caption action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above caption case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/14/20) (yv) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for Kayleigh E. McGlynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21594424. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION for Kayleigh E. McGlynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21594424. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of PHV Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(McGlynn, Kayleigh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JUANITA R. BROOKS granting #44 Motion for Juanita R. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Juanita R. Brooks, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above caption action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above caption case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/9/20) (yv) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #44 MOTION for Juanita R. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION for Juanita R. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of PHV Motion, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Brooks, Juanita) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRAECIPE filed by Susan E. Morrison on behalf of Mujae Group, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue Spotify AB (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Susan E. Morrison, #2 Summons to Spotify AB)(Morrison, Susan) Modified on 5/13/2020 (dlw). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRAECIPE filed by Susan E. Morrison on behalf of Mujae Group, Inc. requesting Clerk to issue Spotify Technology S.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Susan E. Morrison, #2 Summons)(Morrison, Susan) Modified on 5/13/2020 (dlw). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Esha Bandyopadhyay, Juanita R. Brooks, Lawrence K. Kolodney, Kayleigh E. McGlynn, Cheryl Wang and Michael T. Zoppo filed by Mujae Group, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/7/2020. (dlw) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mujae Group, Inc.: For Spotify USA Inc. waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Morrison, Susan) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Esha Bandyopadhyay, Juanita R. Brooks, Lawrence K. Kolodney, Kayleigh E. McGlynn, Cheryl Wang and Michael T. Zoppo - filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (Morrison, Susan) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Spotify USA Inc. on 4/30/2020. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR THEFT OF TRADE SECRETS, MISAPPROPRIATION, AND UNFAIR COMPETITION - filed with Jury Demand against Spotify AB, Spotify Ltd, Spotify Technology S.A., Spotify USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2910714.) - filed by Mujae Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/21/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spotify USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence K. Kolodney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Esha Bandyopadhyay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T Zoppo