This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2019 at 07:32:35 (UTC).

Muir v. Danner et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Muir filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Danner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Alistair Newbern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Alistair Newbern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir

Defendants

Chris Mace

Ray Smith

Jordan Danner

City of Livingston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles D. Buckholts

40 Burton Hills Boulevard, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37215

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Hurley Rader, III

Attorney at Moore, Rader, Fitzpatrick and York, P.C.

46 N. Jefferson Ave., P O Box 3347

Cookeville, TN 38501

Randall A. York

Attorney at Moore, Rader, Fitzpatrick and York, P.C.

46 N. Jefferson Ave., P O Box 3347

Cookeville, TN 38501

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Livingston, Jordan Danner, Chris Mace, Ray Smith.(Rader, Daniel) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#10

(#10) ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jordan Danner.(Service packets issued at the front counter and given to the attorney.) (am) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir as to Chris Mace. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir as to Ray Smith. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir as to Jordan Danner. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir. City of Livingston served on 3/13/2019. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/4/2019) (am). (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons issued as to City of Livingston, Jordan Danner, Chris Mace, Ray Smith. (am) (Summons picked up by attorney at the front counter.) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jordan Danner, Chris Mace, Ray Smith, City of Livingston (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2863791), filed by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Hurley Rader, III, Randall A. York. (am) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Livingston, Jordan Danner, Chris Mace, Ray Smith.(Rader, Daniel) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jordan Danner.(Service packets issued at the front counter and given to the attorney.) (am) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir as to Chris Mace. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir as to Ray Smith. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir as to Jordan Danner. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS returned executed by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir. City of Livingston served on 3/13/2019. (Buckholts, Charles) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 3/5/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Charles D. Buckholts. (am) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/4/2019) (am). (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons issued as to City of Livingston, Jordan Danner, Chris Mace, Ray Smith. (am) (Summons picked up by attorney at the front counter.) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jordan Danner, Chris Mace, Ray Smith, City of Livingston (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2863791), filed by Kemisha Michelle-Ann Muir. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less