This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2023 at 07:48:19 (UTC).

Muhamov v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Muhamov filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shorhat Muhamov

Defendants

United States of America

Department of Homeland Security

Alejandro Mayorkas

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service

Ur Mendoza Jaddou

USCIS Texas Service Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy M Hsu

Ronen Sarraf

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #7 Notice of Dismissal. (oyh) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Dismissal Voluntary filed by Shorhat Muhamov (Hsu, Amy) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Docket(#6) Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (ndt) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shorhat Muhamov. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hsu, Amy) (Main Document 5 replaced to flatten pdf on 1/6/2023) (sxf). (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Correction filed by Shorhat Muhamov (Hsu, Amy) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service, USCIS Texas Service Center, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mms) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Shorhat Muhamov. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13414743) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) Civil Cover Sheet) (Hsu, Amy) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten pdf on 1/5/2023) (mms). Modified on 1/5/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less