This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:34:38 (UTC).

Muhammad v. Nusshaum et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Muhammad filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Nusshaum. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrea R. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07969

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrea R. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Naim Muhammad

Sheridan, IL 60551

Defendants

Barajas

Unknown

Nusshaum

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Naim Muhammad for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit). (mc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Naim Muhammad for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (Envelope postmarked 1/27/20) (kp, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER from Plaintiff dated 1/22/20. (Envelope postmarked 1/27/20) (kp, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed to screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, he must either (1) prepay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00, or (2) submit a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the instructions in the Statement section of this Order. Failure to comply with this order by 1/31/2020 will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the Court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this case for failure to comply with a Court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this Order. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/20/2019.Mailed notice(smm, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Naim Muhammad for attorney representation (mc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Naim Muhammad for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (Envelope postmarked 1/27/20) (kp, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Plaintiff dated 1/22/20. (Envelope postmarked 1/27/20) (kp, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketMAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of Order dated 12/20/19 to Plaintiff Naim Muhammad. (smm, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed to screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, he must either (1) prepay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00, or (2) submit a renewed application to proceed in forma pauperis that complies with the instructions in the Statement section of this Order. Failure to comply with this order by 1/31/2020 will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the Court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this case for failure to comply with a Court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this Order. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/20/2019.Mailed notice(smm, ) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Naim Muhammad for attorney representation (mc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Naim Muhammad for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit). (mc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Naim Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 12/2/2019)(mc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.