This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 07:37:35 (UTC).

Muhammad v. Life Insurance Company Of North America

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 Muhammad filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Life Insurance Company Of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip G. Reinhard and Margaret J. Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-50332

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip G. Reinhard

Referral Judge

Margaret J. Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salahadin Muhammad

Defendant

Life Insurance Company Of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E. Tuite

Attorney at Tuite Law

1111 S. Alpine Road #400

Rockford, IL 61108

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Keenan Ryan

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer J. Kalas

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

322 Indianapolis Blvd, Suire 201`

Schererville, IN 46375

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Salahadin Muhammad; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19871086.(Tuite, Gregory) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tuite, Gregory) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Salahadin Muhammad by Gregory E. Tuite (Tuite, Gregory) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America by Jennifer J. Kalas (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION by Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America for extension of time to file answer (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America by Daniel Keenan Ryan (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #5 is granted. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 11/22/22. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#8

(#8) Western Division ADR Notification (jp, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America for extension of time to file answer (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant's second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #9 , is granted. Defendant has until 12/06/22 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint.Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant's second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #9 , is granted. Defendant has until 12/06/22 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint.Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America for extension of time to file answer (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Western Division ADR Notification (jp, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #5 is granted. Defendant is to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 11/22/22. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America by Daniel Keenan Ryan (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America for extension of time to file answer (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America by Jennifer J. Kalas (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Life Insurance Company Of North America (emc, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (pg, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Salahadin Muhammad by Gregory E. Tuite (Tuite, Gregory) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tuite, Gregory) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Salahadin Muhammad; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19871086.(Tuite, Gregory) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less