This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:27:49 (UTC).

Mueller v. Sam's West, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Mueller filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sam's West, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06888

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Mueller

Defendants

Sam's West, Inc. a foreign corporation doing business as Sam's Club

Walmart doing business as Sam's Club

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James A McCarron

Attorney at Malman Law

17Th Floor, 205 W. Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

James P. Balog

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer, LLC

One E. Wacker Drive, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Law Division, case number (2021 L 009883) filed by Walmart Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19003771. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Balog, James) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Balog, James) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by James P. Balog (Balog, James) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by Victor J Aberdeen (Aberdeen, Victor) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record.(rp, ) (rp, ). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Joint written status report is due by 3/23/2022. Mailed notice (cp, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Joint written status report is due by 3/23/2022. Mailed notice (cp, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record.(rp, ) (rp, ). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by Victor J Aberdeen (Aberdeen, Victor) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketMAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Plaintiff Robert Mueller. (lw, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, ) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by James P. Balog (Balog, James) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Balog, James) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Law Division, case number (2021 L 009883) filed by Walmart Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19003771. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Balog, James) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sam's West, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James P. Balog