This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2020 at 08:36:31 (UTC).

Mueller v. Move Inc

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Mueller filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Move Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01374

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Suzanne Z Mueller

Defendant

Move Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robin Williams Phillips

Attorney at LASHER HOLZAPFEL SPERRY & EBBERSON

601 Union St, Ste 2600

Seattle, WA 98101-4000

Shannon L Trivett

Attorney at LASHER HOLZAPFEL SPERRY & EBBERSON

601 Union St, Ste 2600

Seattle, WA 98101-4000

Defendant Attorneys

Molly Gabel

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

999 Third Ave Ste 4700

Seattle, WA 98104

Amanda J Hailey

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP (SEA)

999 Third Ave Ste 4700

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

#17

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Summons

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *5-10 days*. Jury Trial is set for 6/13/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 12/10/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/15/2021, Motions due by 1/14/2022, Discovery completed by 2/14/2022, Dispositive motions due by 3/15/2022, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/29/2022, Motions in Limine due by 5/16/2022, Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2022, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/8/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/8/2022.. (LC) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by Move Inc.(Hailey, Amanda) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5-10. (Hailey, Amanda) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER re Parties' #20 Stipulation for An Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with an Answer and any Affirmative Defenses and/or Counterclaims is extended to and including November 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LH) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and More Definitive Statement ; by Defendant Move Inc. (Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Suzanne Z Mueller, to #12 MOTION to Dismiss and More Definitive Statement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trivett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Move Inc, filed by Suzanne Z Mueller.(Trivett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PRAECIPE re #14 Notice of Appearance Corrected Signature Page by Plaintiff Suzanne Z Mueller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Trivett, Shannon) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #14 Notice of Appearance was not signed signed by Shannon L Trivett. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (PM) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Move Inc. (Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amanda J Hailey on behalf of Defendant Move Inc. (Hailey, Amanda) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)ad hoc Attorney Hailey (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Move, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Terry Kontonickas re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Move, Inc. (Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Molly Gabel re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Move, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Move, Inc. (Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Unfiled in State Court, case number Number Not Available; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6605999), filed by Move, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gabel, Molly) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robin Williams Phillips