This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2019 at 08:27:47 (UTC).

Mucu v. Thompson et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Mucu filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Thompson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth S. Chestney and David A. Ezra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01142

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth S. Chestney

Presiding Judge

David A. Ezra

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lucy Angelica Caal Mucu

Karnes City, TX 78118

Respondents

Melissa de Leon

Rose Thompson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

John F. Paniszczyn

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 N.W. Loop 410, #600

San Antonio, TX 78216-5512

Lacy L. McAndrew

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 Nw Loop 410, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Faith Johnson Lowry

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 Nw Loop 410, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

Noah M. Schottenstein

Attorney at Assistant United States Attorney

601 N.W. Loop 410, Ste. 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Rose Thompson, Melissa de Leon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McAndrew, Lacy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge David A. Ezra. Respondent's responsive pleading is due on or before November 15, 2019.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Rose Thompson, Melissa de Leon. (McAndrew, Lacy) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (mgr) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certified Mail Receipt #7012 2920 0001 7999 9702 addressed to John F. Paniszczyn of #3 Order (rg) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER/RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Opening Letter to Lucy Angelica Caal Mucu. (dtg) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00; receipt number 500051027), filed by Lucy Angelica Caal Mucu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(dtg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (dtg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DAVID A. EZRA. (dtg) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah M. Schottenstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faith Johnson Lowry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacy L. McAndrew

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Paniszczyn