This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 07:31:40 (UTC).

Mucciolo v. Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Mucciolo filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce E. Reinhart and Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-80185

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mario Mucciolo

Yukon, OK 73099

Defendants

Boca Raton Regional Hospital, Inc.

Jane Does

John Does

Bocacare

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 02/07/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Mucciolo. (ac) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00044. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/7/2019. (llg) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint filed by Mario Mucciolo Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 02/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo.(ac) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Mario Mucciolo. Plf is DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a First Amended Complaint which provides all of the missing jurisdictional information (as fully set out in this order). Plf is also DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a short notice to the court explaining any reason why this action should not be either dismissed or transferred, given the apparent lack of venue in this district. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/23/2019. (llg) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/17/19. (mc) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Transfer Venue to Southern District of Florida by Mario Mucciolo. (ac) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Bocacare, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint filed by Mario Mucciolo Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 02/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 02/07/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#9) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:19-cv-00044. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/7/2019. (llg) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Transfer Venue to Southern District of Florida by Mario Mucciolo. (ac) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo.(ac) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Mario Mucciolo. Plf is DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a First Amended Complaint which provides all of the missing jurisdictional information (as fully set out in this order). Plf is also DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of this date, a short notice to the court explaining any reason why this action should not be either dismissed or transferred, given the apparent lack of venue in this district. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/23/2019. (llg) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 1/17/19. (mc) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Mucciolo. (ac) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Boca Raton Regional Hospital Inc, Bocacare, Jane Does, John Does filed by Mario Mucciolo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less