This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 07:27:32 (UTC).

MTGLQ Investors, L.P. v. Edward Steven Ponce et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 MTGLQ Investors, L P filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Edward Steven Ponce. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02308

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTGLQ Investors, L.P.

Defendants

Does 1 through 20, Inclusive

Anna M Ponce

San Bernardino, CA 92411

Edward Steven Ponce

San Bernardino, CA 92411

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nabeel M Zuberi

Attorney at McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce LLP

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1720

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (twdb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of San Bernardino, case number UDFS1905248 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal Remanding case to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case number UDFS1905248. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#10

(#10) Receipt of REMAND LETTER from Superior Court of California, San Bernardino County. (twdb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce, re Notice of Removal, #1 served on 12/3/2019. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#9

(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, San Bernardino County. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, San Bernardino County. (twdb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Receipt of REMAND LETTER from Superior Court of California, San Bernardino County. (twdb) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, San Bernardino County. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, San Bernardino County. (twdb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal Remanding case to Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case number UDFS1905248. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (twdb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IFP Denial and Order Remanding issued by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge Bernal for approval. (jlo) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce, re Notice of Removal, #1 served on 12/3/2019. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER #1 filed by Defendants Anna M Ponce, Edward Steven Ponce. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 .(et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of San Bernardino, case number UDFS1905248 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym., filed by Defendant Edward Steven Ponce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.