This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2023 at 07:25:38 (UTC).

MTG, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 MTG, INC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg and David R. Grand. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-10048

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Appellant

Guy Vining

Appellees

Comerica Bank

American Casualty Company

Garan Lucow Miller, P.C.

Plunkett & Cooney PC

In Re

MTG, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Guy C. Vining

Barbara D. Urlaub

Appellee Attorneys

Joseph J. Shannon, III

Jeffrey M. Frank

Omar J Harb

Courtney A. Krause

Brian D. Einhorn

Trent B. Collier

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Guy Vining, Bankruptcy Court case number 95-48268. Note: Appeal Fee Deferred. (VLun) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara D. Urlaub on behalf of Guy Vining. (Urlaub, Barbara) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey M. Frank appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Frank, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Omar J Harb appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Harb, Omar) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#6

(#6) Stipulated ORDER to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SSch) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *1/27/23*. Designated lead case number is *22-12661*. (SSch) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *1/27/23*. Designated lead case number is *22-12661*. (SSch) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulated ORDER to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (SSch) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Omar J Harb appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Harb, Omar) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey M. Frank appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Frank, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara D. Urlaub on behalf of Guy Vining. (Urlaub, Barbara) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Guy Vining, Bankruptcy Court case number 95-48268. Note: Appeal Fee Deferred. (VLun) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less