This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 07:12:40 (UTC).

MTG, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 MTG, INC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-12661

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Appellant

Guy C. Vining

Appellees

Charles J. Taunt & Associates

American Casualty Company

Comerica Bank

Plunkett and Cooney, P.C.

In Re

MTG, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

E. Michael Morris

Guy C. Vining

Todd M. Halbert

Appellee Attorneys

Courtney A. Krause

Jeffrey M. Frank

Omar J Harb

Joseph J. Shannon, III

Jeffrey G. Raphelson

Robert J. Diehl, Jr.

Brian D. Einhorn

David C. Anderson

Trent B. Collier

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Guy C. Vining, Bankruptcy Court case number 95-48268. Note: Appeal Fee Deferred. (VLun) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Trent B. Collier on behalf of Plunkett and Cooney, P.C.. (Collier, Trent) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Anderson on behalf of Plunkett and Cooney, P.C.. (Anderson, David) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey M. Frank appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Frank, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Omar J Harb appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Harb, Omar) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Courtney A. Krause appearing on behalf of Charles J. Taunt & Associates (Krause, Courtney) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph J. Shannon, III appearing on behalf of Comerica Bank (Shannon, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey G. Raphelson appearing on behalf of Comerica Bank (Raphelson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert J. Diehl, Jr appearing on behalf of Comerica Bank (Diehl, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#11

(#11) Designated Bankruptcy Record. Note: Appellant did not file a Designation of Record (VLun) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY NOTICE of Receipt of Complete Record on Appeal (VLun) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Designated Bankruptcy Record. Note: Appellant did not file a Designation of Record (VLun) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert J. Diehl, Jr appearing on behalf of Comerica Bank (Diehl, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey G. Raphelson appearing on behalf of Comerica Bank (Raphelson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph J. Shannon, III appearing on behalf of Comerica Bank (Shannon, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Courtney A. Krause appearing on behalf of Charles J. Taunt & Associates (Krause, Courtney) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Omar J Harb appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Harb, Omar) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey M. Frank appearing on behalf of American Casualty Company (Frank, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Anderson on behalf of Plunkett and Cooney, P.C.. (Anderson, David) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Trent B. Collier on behalf of Plunkett and Cooney, P.C.. (Collier, Trent) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (VLun) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Guy C. Vining, Bankruptcy Court case number 95-48268. Note: Appeal Fee Deferred. (VLun) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less