This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:06:52 (UTC).

M.T., individually et al v. Arlington Central School District

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 M T , individually filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Arlington Central School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent L. Briccetti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00437

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vincent L. Briccetti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.T., individually

M.T., on behalf of R.T.

A.T., individually

A.T., on behalf of R.T.

Defendant

Arlington Central School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Oberon Brown

Attorney at Gina DeCrescenzo, P.C.

180A S Broadway, Ste 100

White Plains, NY 10605

Defendant Attorney

Mark Craig Rushfield

Attorney at Shaw, Perelson, May & Lambert, LLP

21 Van Wagner Road

Poughkeepsie, NY 12603

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arlington Central School District, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by A.T., individually, A.T., on behalf of R.T., M.T., individually, M.T., on behalf of R.T...(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arlington Central School District. (sj) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Arlington Central School District served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. Service was accepted by Margie Flynn, District Clerk. Document filed by M.T., individually; A.T., on behalf of R.T.; A.T., individually; M.T., on behalf of R.T...(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Craig Rushfield on behalf of Arlington Central School District..(Rushfield, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Accordingly, by February 22, 2022, defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint, or request an extension of time do so. SO ORDERED. Arlington Central School District answer due 2/22/2022. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/15/2022) (mml) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant may dispense with an Answer. The case shall be decided based on a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. 2. The complete administrative record which culminated in and includes the September 17, 2021, decision of the New York State Department of Education, Office of State Review in administrative case no. 21-174 shall be sent to the Court from the Office of State Review. 3. For the reasons stated in the parties' joint letter, said administrative record shall be filed under seal. 4. A motion schedule is established as follows: a. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment: due May 3, 2022; b. Defendant's opposition papers: due July 12, 2022; c. Plaintiffs' Reply Papers, if Any: due August 11, 2022. 5. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the letter motion. (Doc. #8). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/24/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 5/3/2022. Responses due by 7/12/2022 Replies due by 8/11/2022. (tg) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant may dispense with an Answer. The case shall be decided based on a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. 2. The complete administrative record which culminated in and includes the September 17, 2021, decision of the New York State Department of Education, Office of State Review in administrative case no. 21-174 shall be sent to the Court from the Office of State Review. 3. For the reasons stated in the parties' joint letter, said administrative record shall be filed under seal. 4. A motion schedule is established as follows: a. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment: due May 3, 2022; b. Defendant's opposition papers: due July 12, 2022; c. Plaintiffs' Reply Papers, if Any: due August 11, 2022. 5. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the letter motion. (Doc. #8). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/24/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Telephone Conference held on 2/24/2022. (dh) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER deferring ruling on #8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: The Court has not followed the parties' proposed procedure before and will therefore conduct a telephone conference with counsel to discuss their proposal. A telephone conference is scheduled for 2/24/2022 at 11:00 a.m. Call-in number: (888) 363-4749. Passcode: 1703567. Defendant's time to file an answer or other response to the complaint is adjourned without date. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (Briccetti, Vincent) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion and Response in Lieu of Answer addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Benjamin Brown dated February 21, 2022. Document filed by A.T., individually, A.T., on behalf of R.T., M.T., individually, M.T., on behalf of R.T.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Accordingly, by February 22, 2022, defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint, or request an extension of time do so. SO ORDERED. Arlington Central School District answer due 2/22/2022. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 2/15/2022) (mml) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Craig Rushfield on behalf of Arlington Central School District..(Rushfield, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Arlington Central School District served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. Service was accepted by Margie Flynn, District Clerk. Document filed by M.T., individually; A.T., on behalf of R.T.; A.T., individually; M.T., on behalf of R.T...(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arlington Central School District. (sj) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arlington Central School District, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by A.T., individually, A.T., on behalf of R.T., M.T., individually, M.T., on behalf of R.T...(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arlington Central School District. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25599277)Document filed by M.T., individually, A.T., on behalf of R.T., A.T., individually, M.T., on behalf of R.T.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M.T. is a litigant

Latest cases where A.T. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Craig Rushfield