This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:21:46 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC et al v. Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24199

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MSPA Claims 1, LLC

2701 S. Lejeune Rd., 10Th Floor

Miami, FL 33134

MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC

2701 S. Lejeune Rd., 10Th Floor

Miami, FL 33134

Defendants

Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company

Three Bala Plaza, Ste. 400

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange

White Plains, NY 10601

Safety National Casualty Corporation

1832 Schuetz Road

St. Louis, MO 63146

Pure Insurance Company

800 Corporate Drive, Ste. 420

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33334

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Three Bala Plaza, Ste. 400

Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Hasan Ruiz

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

5000 Sw 75Th Ave, Suite 400

Miami, FL 33155

Jose Alfredo De Armas

Attorney at Armas Law Firm

4960 Sw 72 Avenue, Suite #206

Miami, FL 33155

Michael O. Mena

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

2701 S. Le Jeune Road, Ste Floor 10

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Eduardo Enrique Bertran

Attorney at Armas Law Firm

4960 S.W. 72 Avenue, Suite 206

Miami, FL 33155

Francesco Antonio Zincone, III

Attorney at Armas Bertran Pieri

4960 S.W. 72 Avenue Miami, Florida 33155, Suite 206

Miami, FL 33155

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Besvinick

Attorney at Stroock and Stroock and Lavan, LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3100

Miami, FL 33131

Benjamine Reid

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt

100 Se 2Nd Street, Suite 4200, Po Box 019101

Miami, FL 33131-9101

D Matthew Allen

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.

4221 West Boy Scout Blvd., Suite 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Michael O. Mena (Mena, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamine Reid on behalf of Pure Insurance Company. Attorney Benjamine Reid added to party Pure Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Reid, Benjamine) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D Matthew Allen on behalf of Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange(pty:dft). (Allen, D) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Attorney Benjamine Reid added to party Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Reid, Benjamine) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, Defendants Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Safety National Casualty Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Safety National Casualty Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. All Defendants. (Ruiz, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#5

(#11) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to District Judge Aileen M Cannon for all further proceedings, Chief Judge K. Michael Moore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #8

Summon(s) Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange

1 #7

Summon(s) Safety National Casualty Corporation

1 #6

Summon(s) Pure Insurance Company

1 #5

Summon(s) Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

1 #4

Summon(s) Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action for Damages) against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13686170, filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summon(s) Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, #5 Summon(s) Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, #6 Summon(s) Pure Insurance Company, #7 Summon(s) Safety National Casualty Corporation, #8 Summon(s) Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange)(Ruiz, John) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Michael O. Mena re #13 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Michael O. Mena has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Michael O. Mena (Mena, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamine Reid on behalf of Pure Insurance Company. Attorney Benjamine Reid added to party Pure Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Reid, Benjamine) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to District Judge Aileen M Cannon for all further proceedings, Chief Judge K. Michael Moore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by D Matthew Allen on behalf of Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Attorney D Matthew Allen added to party Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange(pty:dft). (Allen, D) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. #8 . Plaintiffs filed the Complaint on October 13, 2020 #1 , and Defendant was served on October 20, 2020. #5 . Thus, Defendant's response is due on or before November 10, 2020. Id. Now, Defendant requests that the Court extend the deadline for it to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 9, 2021. #8 at 2. Defendant explains that it requires an extension in order to appropriately investigate and respond to the allegations in Plaintiffs' eighty-five (85) page putative class action Complaint. Id. at 1. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #8 is GRANTED. Defendant Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 9, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/9/2020. (tgr) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, by Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. Attorney Benjamine Reid added to party Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Reid, Benjamine) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. #6 . Plaintiffs filed the Complaint on October 13, 2020 #1 , and Defendants were served on October 20, 2020. #5 . Thus, Defendants' response is due on or before November 10, 2020. Id. Now, Defendants request that the Court extend the deadline for them to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 9, 2021. #6 at 1. Defendants explain that they require an extension in order to appropriately investigate and respond to the allegations in Plaintiffs' eighty-five (85) page putative class action Complaint. Id. at 2. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #6 is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 9, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/5/2020. (tgr) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,, Defendants Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Safety National Casualty Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Safety National Casualty Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Besvinick, Laura) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. All Defendants. (Ruiz, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC identifying Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company for MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC; Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims 1, LLC (Ruiz, John) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange, Pure Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company. (cds) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action for Damages) against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13686170, filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summon(s) Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company, #5 Summon(s) Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, #6 Summon(s) Pure Insurance Company, #7 Summon(s) Safety National Casualty Corporation, #8 Summon(s) Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange)(Ruiz, John) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tokio Marine Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Safety National Casualty Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Pure Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MSPA Claims 1, LLC is a litigant