Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2020 at 08:07:32 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Actavis Elizabeth LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Actavis Elizabeth LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Series PMPI

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC

Defendants

PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.

MYLAN INC

HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC

DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.

ACTAVIS ELIZABETH LLC

ACTAVIS HOLDCO U.S. INC.

MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

IMPAX LABORATORIES, LLC

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

MYLAN N.V

ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.

WOCKHARDT USA LLC

BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.

Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Lannet Company, Inc.

PAR Phamaceuticals, Inc.

WEST--WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER L. COFFIN

Attorney at PENDLEY BAUDIN COFFIN LLP

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2505

New Orleans, LA 70163

ANNA K. HIGGINS

Attorney at PENDLEY BAUDIN & COFFIN LLP

1100 Poydras St Suite 2505

New Orleans, LA 70163

TRACY L. TURNER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF TRACY L. TURNER

7573 Ogden Woods Blvd

New Albany, OH 43054

Defendant Attorneys

VICTORIA PENG

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

101 Park Ave

New York, NY 10178

GRANT R. MACQUEEN

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

101 Park Ave

New York, NY 10178

STACEY ANNE MAHONEY

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by GRANT R. MACQUEEN on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MACQUEEN, GRANT) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA PENG on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(PENG, VICTORIA) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#17

(#17) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Pensa Investments, S.L., Towa Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. with Certificate of Service by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(MAHONEY, STACEY) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAHONEY, STACEY) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/13/2020. 2/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 1235 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by TRACY L. TURNER on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, Series PMPI with Certificate of Service(TURNER, TRACY) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER L. COFFIN on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, Series PMPI with Certificate of Service(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by ANNA K. HIGGINS on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, Series PMPI with Certificate of Service(HIGGINS, ANNA) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

11 #2

Certificate of Service

#2

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series PMPI, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #10

Replacement PDF for Complaint

1 #9

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) EXHIBIT E-1, E-2 AND E-3 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series PMPI re #1 Complaint,,,,,. (Coffin, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by GRANT R. MACQUEEN on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MACQUEEN, GRANT) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA PENG on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(PENG, VICTORIA) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Pensa Investments, S.L., Towa Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. with Certificate of Service by BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC..(MAHONEY, STACEY) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by STACEY ANNE MAHONEY on behalf of BRECKENRIDGE PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(MAHONEY, STACEY) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ATTACHED STIPULATION IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/13/2020. 2/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE PAPER # 1235 IN 16-MD-2724) (ems) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by TRACY L. TURNER on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, Series PMPI with Certificate of Service(TURNER, TRACY) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER L. COFFIN on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, Series PMPI with Certificate of Service(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by ANNA K. HIGGINS on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, Series PMPI with Certificate of Service(HIGGINS, ANNA) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION TO WAIVE SERVICE AND EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, Series PMPI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(COFFIN, CHRISTOPHER)**FWD to Judge for approval** Modified on 2/7/2020 (kp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01972. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2020
  • JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 1/7/2020. (Oliver, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2020: #1 MAIN DOCUMENT) (Oliver, T.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series PMPI identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims 1, LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery, LLC, Corporate Parent RD Legal Finance LLC for Series PMPI. (Coffin, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXHIBIT E-1, E-2 AND E-3 by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Series PMPI re #1 Complaint,,,,,. (Coffin, Christopher) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, Series PMPI, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2020. Discovery due by 6/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/16/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Holdco US, Inc., Akorn, Inc., Apotex Corp., Breckenridge Pharmaceutical, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Epic Pharma, LLC, Fougera Pharmaceuticals Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hi-Tech Pharmaceutical Co., Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Lannet Company, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Phamaceuticals, Inc., Perrigo Company PLC, Perrigo New York, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Taro Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teligent, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Upsher-Smith Laboratories, LLC, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5593828.), filed by SERIES PMPI, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E-1, # 7 Exhibit E-2, # 8 Exhibit E-3, #9 Exhibit F)(Coffin, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #10 Replacement PDF for Complaint) (Hushin, Z.). Modified on 12/18/2019 to add replacement PDF for complaint and correct parties (Hushin, Z.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 1/14/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lannet Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant