This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:43:30 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Abbvie Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2019 MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Abbvie Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JAN E. DUBOIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01621

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAN E. DUBOIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC

MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC

MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS SALES CORP

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS (USA) INC.

ABBOTT RESPIRATORY LLC

BARR PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

ABBVIE INC

DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS INC

Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRACY L. TURNER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF TRACY L. TURNER

1515 Poydras Street, Suite 1400

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) COPY OF PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1407(a) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE DOCKET IN MASTER FILE NO. 2460 SHALL CONSTITUTE THE MASTER DOCKET IN THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THIS ORIGINAL ORDER IN THE MASTER DOCKET AND COPIES OF THIS ORDER IN THE DOCKETS OF THE SEVENTEEN ACTIONS LISTED IN SCHEDULE A ATTACHED HERETO. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK EACH OF THOSE INDIVIDUAL DOCKETS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. ALL OF THE PENDING DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULE A ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PRETRIAL PURPOSES. AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/29/2014 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 12-B, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 12/23/2013. 5/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.**(ENTERED PER ORDER FILED ON 5/16/2019)** (tjd) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER THAT 19-CV-1621 IS CONSOLIDATED WITH THE END-PAYOR ACTIONS FOR ALL PRETRIAL PURPOSES; THE CLERK SHALL DOCKET A COPY OF THE PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER DATED DECEMBER 23, 2013 IN THE NEWLY-FILED ACTION; THE CLERK SHALL MAKE THE APPROPRIATE ENTRY IN THE MASTER DOCKET; THE CLERK SHALL MARK THE NEWLY-FILED ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/16/2019; 5/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE DOCUMENT 655 IN 13-MD-2460). (tjd) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES TO THE NEWLY TRANSFERRED CASE SHALL ON OR BEFORE 5/13/2019 FILE AND SERVE ANY OBJECTION TO PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO THE PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1407(a) DATED 12/23/2013.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/29/2019. 5/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 642 IN 13-MD-2460)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

(#11) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00892. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#10

(#10) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the US Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 4/12/2019 and certified by the Eastern District of PA Clerk's Office on 4/12/2019. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#9

(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the US District Court for the Eastern District of PA. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols on 4/12/2019. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/15/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transferr by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay the Deadline to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/5/2019. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

1 #15

Exhibit D-10

1 #16

Exhibit D-11

1 #17

Exhibit D-12

1 #18

Exhibit D-13

1 #11

Exhibit D-6

1 #12

Exhibit D-7

1 #13

Exhibit D-8

1 #14

Exhibit D-9

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) COPY OF PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1407(a) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE DOCKET IN MASTER FILE NO. 2460 SHALL CONSTITUTE THE MASTER DOCKET IN THIS CASE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FILE THIS ORIGINAL ORDER IN THE MASTER DOCKET AND COPIES OF THIS ORDER IN THE DOCKETS OF THE SEVENTEEN ACTIONS LISTED IN SCHEDULE A ATTACHED HERETO. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK EACH OF THOSE INDIVIDUAL DOCKETS CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. ALL OF THE PENDING DIRECT PURCHASER ACTIONS IDENTIFIED IN SCHEDULE A ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PRETRIAL PURPOSES. AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/29/2014 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 12-B, U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA 19106; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 12/23/2013. 5/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.**(ENTERED PER ORDER FILED ON 5/16/2019)** (tjd) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER THAT 19-CV-1621 IS CONSOLIDATED WITH THE END-PAYOR ACTIONS FOR ALL PRETRIAL PURPOSES; THE CLERK SHALL DOCKET A COPY OF THE PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER DATED DECEMBER 23, 2013 IN THE NEWLY-FILED ACTION; THE CLERK SHALL MAKE THE APPROPRIATE ENTRY IN THE MASTER DOCKET; THE CLERK SHALL MARK THE NEWLY-FILED ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 5/16/2019; 5/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE DOCUMENT 655 IN 13-MD-2460). (tjd) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES TO THE NEWLY TRANSFERRED CASE SHALL ON OR BEFORE 5/13/2019 FILE AND SERVE ANY OBJECTION TO PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO THE PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1407(a) DATED 12/23/2013.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/29/2019. 5/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL. (SEE DOCKET NO. 642 IN 13-MD-2460)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00892. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Case transferred to District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the US Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 4/12/2019 and certified by the Eastern District of PA Clerk's Office on 4/12/2019. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2): This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the US District Court for the Eastern District of PA. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols on 4/12/2019. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay the Deadline to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/5/2019. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Transferr by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Potential Tag Along in JPML) (Coffin, Christopher) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Respiratory, LLC, Abbvie Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Plaintiffs MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC re #2 Order to Show Cause, Notice of Filing of Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Order) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the review of plaintiffsClass Action Complaint, in which they state that the Judicial Panelon Multidistrict Litigation has ruled that the case should beconsolidated in an action in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania(Doc. 1 10), and the Court being advised, IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file a copy of said Order on or before February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 02/06/2019. (bjc) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Respiratory, LLC, Abbvie Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc., Duramed Pharmaceuticals Sales Corp., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6725160), filed by MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, Series, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D-1, #7 Exhibit D-2, #8 Exhibit D-3, #9 Exhibit D-4, #10 Exhibit D-5, #11 Exhibit D-6, #12 Exhibit D-7, #13 Exhibit D-8, #14 Exhibit D-9, #15 Exhibit D-10, #16 Exhibit D-11, #17 Exhibit D-12, #18 Exhibit D-13, #19 Exhibit D-14, #20 Exhibit D-15, #21 Exhibit D-16, #22 Exhibit D-17, #23 Exhibit D-18, #24 Exhibit D-19) (Turner, Tracy) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 4/15/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.