This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 22:56:14 (UTC).

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company et al v. Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, a Nevada Trust et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, a Nevada Trust. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08602

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Appellants

MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company

MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company

MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company

MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company

Appellees

Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, a Nevada Trust

John F Luikart, Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust

Sandra R Hernandez, M.D., Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Alan Jay Friedman

Attorney at Shulman Bastian Friedman Bui LLP

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92618

Robert Strongarone

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

2701 S. Lejeune Rd., 10Th Floor

Miami, FL 33134

Gary Pemberton

Attorney at Shulman Hodges Bastian LLP

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92618

Janpaul Portal

Attorney at MSP Recovery Law Firm

2701 S. Le Jeune Road, 10Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Appellee Attorneys

Gary S. Fergus

Attorney at Fergus A Law Firm

595 Market Street, Suite 2430

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael Richard Weiss

Attorney at Akerman LLP

601 West Fifth Street, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Valerie Greenberg

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Three Brickell City Centre, 98 Southeast Seventh Street

Miami, FL 33131

Eve Helen Karasik

Attorney at Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.

2818 La Cienega Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Jeffrey Sai-Kid Kwong

Attorney at Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.

2818 La Cienega Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90034

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying #2 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

25 #25

Main Document

3 #1

Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

2 #6

Transmittal to District Court

2 #5

Appendix

2 #4

Request for Judicial Notice

2 #3

Memorandum in Support

2 #2

Motion to Withdraw Reference

2 #1

Docket Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

1 #6

Transmittal to District Court

1 #5

Appendix

1 #4

Request for Judicial Notice

1 #3

Memorandum in Support

1 #2

Motion to Withdraw Reference

1 #1

Docket Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying #2 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Strongarone. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2022) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert Strongarone ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16975455.) filed by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Strongarone, Robert) (Filed on 3/9/2022) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jan Paul Portal. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16970572.) filed by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Portal, Janpaul) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJohn F Luikart, Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, a Nevada Trust, Sandra R Hernandez, M.D., Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weiss, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Court Reference. Motion Hearing previously set for March 10, 2022 is continued to April 14, 2022 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Court Reference re #19 Response,, filed by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Pemberton, Gary) (Filed on 2/14/2022) Modified on 2/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Court Reference re #2 Withdrawal of Reference,, by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Pemberton, Gary) (Filed on 2/14/2022) Modified on 2/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Request for Judicial Notice In Support Of Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Withdraw The Bankruptcy Court Reference [ECF 17] filed byJohn F Luikart, Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, a Nevada Trust, Sandra R Hernandez, M.D., Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust. (Weiss, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Court Reference by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Pemberton, Gary) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Renotice motion hearing of Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Court Reference filed by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Pemberton, Gary) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER of Referral for Related Case Determination (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by John F Luikart, Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, a Nevada Trust, Sandra R Hernandez, M.D., Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust (Karasik, Eve) (Filed on 11/9/2021) Modified on 11/10/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company (Pemberton, Gary) (Filed on 11/8/2021) Modified on 11/9/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING #3 STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LENGTH. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule and Page Length re #2 Withdrawal of Reference,, filed by John F Luikart, Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, a Nevada Trust, Sandra R Hernandez, M.D., Co-Trustee of the Plant Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, - MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, and, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Karasik, Eve) (Filed on 11/4/2021) Modified on 11/5/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court Bankruptcy Court case number USBC, San Francisco, 09-31347.. Filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Motion to Withdraw Reference, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Appendix, #6 Transmittal to District Court)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ***DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #2 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number USBC, San Francisco, 09-31347. File received. Filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, SERIES PMPI, a Segregated Series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company, MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware Series Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Motion to Withdraw Reference, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Appendix, #6 Transmittal to District Court)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less