This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2019 at 07:40:32 (UTC).

Msezane v. Barr et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Msezane filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sibongiseni Mfundo Msezane

Folkston, GA 31537

Respondents

William Barr

ICE Field Director, Atlanta Georgia

Warden P. Garland

Department of Homeland Director / ICE

Patrick Gartland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Jason W. Blanchard

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Augusta

P.O. Box 2017

Augusta, GA 30903

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

*Restricted*

1 #2

Envelope

#2

2 #1

Prepared 285 forms

#3

#4

4 #1

Envelope

#5

#6

6 #1

Exhibit 1

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #3

Exhibit 3

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sibongiseni Mfundo Msezane filed by Patrick Gartland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Blanchard, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 8/9/2019. (ca) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Patrick Gartland on 7/18/19, U.S. Attorney for the SDGA on 7/19/19, and Attorney General of the U.S. on 7/23/19 for #2 Order Directing USMS Service of Process, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sibongiseni Mfundo Msezane. (ca) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Sibongiseni Mfundo Msezane. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ca) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable #2 Order filed 6/1719. Mail sent to Sibongiseni Mfundo Msezane. (ca) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process by registered or certified mail a copy of the #1 Petition and a copy of this Order upon: (1) the Attorney General of the U.S.; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 6/17/2019. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #1 Prepared 285 forms) (ca). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Filing fee payment received, Amount $5.00, Receipt BWK008584. (ca) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Sibongiseni Mfundo Msezane. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #2 Envelope) (ca). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason W. Blanchard