This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2022 at 07:48:01 (UTC).

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A. v. Deere & Co.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2021 MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S A filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Deere Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John P. Cronan and Sarah L Cave. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10081

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

Referral Judge

Sarah L Cave

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A.

Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant and Defendant

Deere & Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent M. DeOrchis

Attorney at Montgomery, McCracken, Walker & Rhoads, LLP (NY)

437 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Counter Claimant, Counter Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Damani C. Sims

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Robert Sanford Friedman

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A...(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEERE & CO., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A...(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deere & Co.. (vf) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/3/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Deere & Co.. Document filed by Deere & Co...(Friedman, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Deere & Co..(Friedman, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and (c). Initial Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 1/3/2022) (tg) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damani C. Sims on behalf of Deere & Co...(Sims, Damani) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A...(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A...(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Damani C. Sims on behalf of Deere & Co...(Sims, Damani) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to call: (866) 390-1828; access code: 380-9799, at the scheduled time. At the conference, the parties must be prepared to discuss the subjects set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and (c). Initial Conference set for 2/3/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave on 1/3/2022) (tg) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Deere & Co..(Friedman, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Deere & Co.. Document filed by Deere & Co...(Friedman, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/3/2021) (jca) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deere & Co.. (vf) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEERE & CO., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A...(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A...(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Deere & Co.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25386259)Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(DeOrchis, Vincent) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deere & Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert S. Friedman