This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2022 at 09:14:05 (UTC).

MSBK, LLC/Gopal International Inc v. AmGuard Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 MSBK, LLC/Gopal International Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmGuard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia A. Crone and Christine L. Stetson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00423

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

Referral Judge

Christine L. Stetson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MSBK LLC/Gopal International Inc doing business as Star Stop#4/Star Stop#3 and Gopal International Inc

Defendants

AmGuard Insurance Company

Great Lakes Insurance U.K. SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek Clinton Brasher

Attorney at The Brasher Law Firm, PLLC

1122 Orleans

Beaumont, TX 77701

Joseph Azor Muckleroy

Attorney at The Brasher Law Firm, PLLC

1122 Orleans

Beaumont, TX 77701

Nishi Vimal Kothari

Attorney at The Brasher Law Firm, PLLC

1122 Orleans

Beaumont, TX 77701

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Hampton Avery

Attorney at Martin, Disiere, Jefferson & Wisdom, LLP

808 Travis, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Jamie Penton Cooper

Attorney at Martin Disiere Jefferson & Wisdom, LLP - Houston

808 Travis, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Christopher Weldon Martin

Attorney at Martin Disiere Jefferson & Wisdom

808 Travis Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Valerie Anne Henderson

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

1301 Mckinney Street, Ste 3700

Houston, TX 77010

Kirsten Diane Vesel

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC - Houston

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Status Conference set for 12/1/2023 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 11/15/2022. (bjc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#17

(#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson: Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing re #13 MOTION to Cap Attorney's Fees filed by Great Lakes Insurance U.K. SE, #11 MOTION to Preclude Attorney Fees filed by AmGuard Insurance Company, held on 11/15/2022. (Court Time: 11:08 am - 12:30 p.m.) (Courtroom Deputy/FTR OP: Sherre White.) (saw, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

13 #13

Main Document

11 #7

Revised Proposed Order

11 #6

Text of Proposed Order

11 #5

Exhibit 5

11 #3

Exhibit 3

11 #1

Exhibit 1

11 #11

Main Document

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Status Conference set for 12/1/2023 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 11/15/2022. (bjc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson: Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearing re #13 MOTION to Cap Attorney's Fees filed by Great Lakes Insurance U.K. SE, #11 MOTION to Preclude Attorney Fees filed by AmGuard Insurance Company, held on 11/15/2022. (Court Time: 11:08 am - 12:30 p.m.) (Courtroom Deputy/FTR OP: Sherre White.) (saw, ) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Preclude Attorney Fees filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Avery, Christopher) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Cap Attorney's Fees , #11 MOTION to Preclude Attorney Fees filed by MSBK LLC/Gopal International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Kothari, Nishi) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2022 at 11:15 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson regarding #11 Motion to Preclude Attorney Fees and #13 Motion to Cap Attorney's Fees (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kothari, Nishi) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Cap Attorney's Fees by Great Lakes Insurance U.K. SE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, Valerie) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 12, Motion to cap attroney's fees. Personal information not redacted. Attorney will re-file.*** (bjc, ) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***FILED IN ERROR.*** MOTION to Cap Attorney's Fees by Great Lakes Insurance U.K. SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henderson, Valerie) Modified on 10/27/2022 (bjc, ). (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Preclude Attorney Fees by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Avery, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2022: #7 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ). (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDERED that Rule 26(f) Attorney conference must occur by 10/20/2022. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2022 11:15 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 10/4/2022. (bjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/3/2022. (bjc, ) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AmGuard Insurance Company (Avery, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Great Lakes Insurance U.K. SE.(bjc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by AmGuard Insurance Company.(bjc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against All Defendants.(bjc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by MSBK LLC/Gopal International Inc. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmGuard Insurance Company from 128th District Court, case number 220349-C. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9157771), filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Christopher) (Attachment 11 replaced on 9/30/2022) (bjc, ). (Attachment 11 replaced on 9/30/2022 with flattened image) (bjc, ). (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Lakes Insurance SE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher H Avery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher W Martin