This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 08:21:00 (UTC).

MS International, Inc. v. Patel et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 MS International, Inc filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Patel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03804

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MS International, Inc.

233 S. Wacker Drive61St Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendants

Pramod Patel

Ankit Shah

Respondent

Century Marble and Granite

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Kenneth Borcia

Attorney at Tressler LLP

233 South Wacker Drive22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606-6399

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Third Party Respondent Citation from Wells Fargo regarding Pramod Patel and Ankit Shah. (nsf, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATUS Report re Joint Initial Status Report by MS International, Inc. (Borcia, James) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Telephonic citation hearing held on 8/26/2021 and continued to 10/12/2021 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203 via telephone. Counsel shall call into 877-402-9753 and utilize participant code 9955840. By agreement, all citations are continued to the next court date. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER by Respondent Century Marble and Granite to Writ of Garnishment Pramod Patel Wage Garnishment Interrogatory Answer (Koschnitzki, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER by Respondent Century Marble and Granite to Writ of Garnishment Ankit Shah Wage Garnishment Interrogatory Answer (Koschnitzki, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Citation to discover assets from chase bank. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER of Third Party Respondent Citation as to Wintrust Bank for Defendants Pramod Patel and Ankit Shah. (ph, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Wells Fargo (Third Party); Wintrust Bank (Third Party); Chase Bank (Third Party). (ph, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Century Marble and Granite. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Citation Hearing for presentment of Citation to Discover Assets Citation Hearing set for 8/26/2021 at 11:00 AM. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Pramod Patal and Ankit Shah. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Citation Hearing for presentment of Citation to Discover Assets Citation Hearing set for 8/26/2021 at 11:00 AM. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Citation Hearing for presentment of Citation to Discover Assets Citation Hearing set for 8/26/2021 at 11:00 AM. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Pramod Patel (notice filed), Ankit Shah (notice filed). (ph, ) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MS International, Inc. by James Kenneth Borcia (Borcia, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Citation to Discover Assets by MS International, Inc. re ANKIT SHAH (Borcia, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Citation to Discover Assets by MS International, Inc. re PRAMOD PATEL (Borcia, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 9/3/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment by MS International, Inc. from UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA, Case Number 18-cv-00 152; Judgment for MS INTERNATIONAL, INC. and against PRAMOD PATEL and ANKIT SHAH, in the amount of $2,210,238.30 entered on 12/07/2018. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-18467060. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borcia, James) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MS INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James K. Borcia