This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2022 at 07:50:38 (UTC).

MRSS Inc v. Morrissette et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 MRSS Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Morrissette. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01696

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MRSS Inc

Defendants

James Peter Morrissette

MT Distribution LLC

Lakshmi Distributors LLC d/b/a C-Store Master

APNA Wholesale LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Angela Holt

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS

200 Clinton Avenue West, Suite 900

Huntsville, AL 35801-4900

Benn Charles Wilson

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jake Michael Gipson

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Ari Scott Meltzer

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Corey Weinstein

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

David Weslow

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Neal Seth

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Robert C Lockwood

Attorney at WILMER & LEE PA

100 Washington Street, Suite 200, P O Box 2168

Huntsville, AL 35804

Teresa Summers

Attorney at WILEY REIN, LLP

2050 M Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER: Attorneys Ari Scott Meltzer, Neal Seth, Teresa Summers, Corey Weinstein, and David Weslow filed motions for admission pro hac vice. Upon review, the court GRANTS the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/15/22. (BJL) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

16 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Serve

16 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Weslow Motion is RIPE 2/14/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Serve)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

15 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration

#15

(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Corey Weinstein Motion is RIPE 2/14/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

14 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Serve

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Teresa Summers Motion is RIPE 2/14/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Serve)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/30/21. (BJL) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants by Clerk for service by Plaintiff. (BJL) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#8) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette.(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#3

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/30/21. (BJL) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by MRSS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: Attorneys Ari Scott Meltzer, Neal Seth, Teresa Summers, Corey Weinstein, and David Weslow filed motions for admission pro hac vice. Upon review, the court GRANTS the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/15/22. (BJL) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-4013174 (B4601118527). (Lockwood, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-4013169 (B4601118526). (Lockwood, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-4013157 (B4601118525). (Lockwood, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-4013147 (B4601118524). (Lockwood, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-4013127 (B4601118528). (Lockwood, Robert) Modified on 2/15/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Weslow Motion is RIPE 2/14/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Serve)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Corey Weinstein Motion is RIPE 2/14/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Teresa Summers Motion is RIPE 2/14/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Serve)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Neal Seth Motion is RIPE 2/14/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Serve)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . The court ORDERS Plaintiff to respond to the motion within 14 days of this order. Defendants may file a reply within 7 days of Plaintiff's response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/10/22. (BJL) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette.(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by MT Distribution LLC, James Peter Morrissette. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Lockwood, Robert) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 12/30/21. (BJL) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number H4601005059 (BJL) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants by Clerk for service by Plaintiff. (BJL) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MRSS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Holt, Angela) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Seal Document by MRSS Inc. (Holt, Angela) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by MRSS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ari Scott Meltzer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corey Weinstein(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal Seth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C Lockwood