This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 08:39:38 (UTC).

Mroz v. Meredith Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Mroz filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Meredith Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles R. Wolle and Ross A Walters(R). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Wolle

Referral Judge

Ross A Walters(R)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Mroz

Petitioner

City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund

Defendants

Thomas H. Harty

Joseph H. Ceryanec

Stephen M. Lacy

Meredith Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce L Braley

Attorney at LEVENTHAL & PUGA P.C.

950 South Cherry Street, Suite 600

Denver, CO 80246

Petitioner Attorneys

John E. Lande

Attorney at DICKINSON MACKAMAN TYLER & HAGEN PC

699 Walnut St, 1600 Hub Tower

Des Moines, IA 50309-3986

Mollie Pawlosky

Attorney at DICKINSON MACKAMAN TYLER & HAGEN PC

699 Walnut St, 1600 Hub Tower

Des Moines, IA 50309-3986

 

Court Documents

4 #8

Text of Proposed Order

4 #7

Exhibit E - BLBG Resume

4 #6

Exhibit D - Notice of pendency of Mroz action

4 #5

Exhibit C - Notice of pendency of Wirthwein action

4 #4

Exhibit B - Loss Chart

4 #3

Exhibit A - Certification

4 #2

Declaration of Mollie Pawlosky

4 #1

Memorandum in Support

#4

(#4) MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mollie Pawlosky, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of pendency of Wirthwein action, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of pendency of Mroz action, #7 Exhibit E - BLBG Resume, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlosky, Mollie) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie Pawlosky on behalf of City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund (Pawlosky, Mollie) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Meredith Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Filing fee paid in the amount of $400, receipt number 0863-3920358., filed by Joseph Mroz. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/11/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meredith Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Braley, Bruce) Modified on 9/13/2019, added payment information (kjw). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel by City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund.Motions referred to Ross A Walters(R). Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mollie Pawlosky, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of pendency of Wirthwein action, #6 Exhibit D - Notice of pendency of Mroz action, #7 Exhibit E - BLBG Resume, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Pawlosky, Mollie) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie Pawlosky on behalf of City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund (Pawlosky, Mollie) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Packet) (sjc) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Filing fee paid in the amount of $400, receipt number 0863-3920358., filed by Joseph Mroz. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/11/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meredith Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Braley, Bruce) Modified on 9/13/2019, added payment information (kjw). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.