This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2020 at 09:27:04 (UTC).

MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC v. Selective Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Conrad, Jr and David S. Cayer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00424

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Conrad, Jr

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC

Defendant

Selective Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles A. Madison

Attorney at Kozyak, Tropin & Throckmorton

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd, 9Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Benjamin J. Widlanski

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., 9Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Gail A. McQuilkin

Attorney at Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd., 9Th Floor

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Andrew Thomas Houston

Attorney at Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1800

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Edward Peterson

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP

620 South Tryon Street, Suite 800

Charlotte, NC 28202

Bradley K Overcash

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein, LLP

Three Wells Fargo Center, 401 South Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Designation

#2

#3

3 #1

Proposed Order

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC (McQuilkin, Gail) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice to Benjamin J.Widlanski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/1/2020. (mek) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice to Gail A. McQuilkin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/1/2020. (mek) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gail A. McQuilkin for MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC; and granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Benjamin J. Widlanski for MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/24/2020. (mek) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Thomas Houston on behalf of MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC (Houston, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin J. Widlanski Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4636941. by MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC. (Houston, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gail A. McQuilkin Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4636934. by MRK Ivey's Hotel, LLC. (Houston, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Selective Insurance Company of America's answer due 9/4/2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/4/2020. (DLG) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Overcash, Bradley). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice to Charles Madison: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Bar of this Court and Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/10/2020. (brl) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Edward Peterson on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America (Peterson, Daniel) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Mecklenburg Co., case number 20-CVS-7571. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4599443), filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Designation)(Overcash, Bradley) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Edward Peterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley K Overcash