Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:26:19 (UTC).

Mr Mason L L C v. S B N V F N B C L L C et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Mr Mason L L C filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against B N. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J Hanna, Robert R Summerhays and Terry A Doughty. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00360

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

Presiding Judges

Robert R Summerhays

Terry A Doughty

 

Party Details

Appellant

Mr Mason L L C

Appellees

Seatran Marine L L C

Steve J Miguez

S B N V F N B C L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Douglas S Draper

Attorney at Heller Draper et al

650 Poydras St Ste 2500

New Orleans, LA 70130

Leslie A Collins

Attorney at Heller Draper et al

650 Poydras St Ste 2500

New Orleans, LA 70130

Greta M Brouphy

Attorney at Heller Draper et al

650 Poydras St Ste 2500

New Orleans, LA 70130

Appellee Attorneys

Stewart F Peck

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Benjamin W Kadden

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Meredith Sue Grabill

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

David F Waguespack

Attorney at Carver Darden et al

1100 Poydras St Ste 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT granting #12 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Appeal. The appeal is Dismissed With Prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/18/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

12 #1

Proposed order

#12

(#12) JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Mr Mason L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Draper, Douglas) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#11

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#10

RESTRICTED

9 #1

BK Docket Sheet Docs 100-198

#9

(#9) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet Docs 100-198)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

8 #1

BK Docket Sheet Docs 1-99

#8

(#8) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet Docs 1-99)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

7 #4

BK Doc 150 Part 10 of 12

7 #3

BK Doc 150 Part 9 of 12

7 #2

BK Doc 150 Part 8 of 12

7 #1

BK Doc 150 Part 7 of 12

#7

(#7) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Doc 150 Part 7 of 12, #2 BK Doc 150 Part 8 of 12, #3 BK Doc 150 Part 9 of 12, #4 BK Doc 150 Part 10 of 12, #5 BK Doc 150 Part 11 of 12, #6 BK Doc 150 Part 12 of 12)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

1 #3

BK Docket Sheet

1 #2

BK Notice of filing Notice of Appeal

1 #1

BK Order Appealed

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 3/7/19 signed by Bankruptcy Judge John W Kolwe filed by Mr Mason LLC. (Attachments: #1 BK Order Appealed, #2 BK Notice of filing Notice of Appeal, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Doucet, M) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT granting #12 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Appeal. The appeal is Dismissed With Prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/18/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Mr Mason L L C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Draper, Douglas) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SEALED DOCUMENT: BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: # 1 BK Doc 113). (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Bankruptcy held on 12/18/2018 before Judge John W Kolwe. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherryl Robinson, Telephone number 504-585-3814. Total pages: 301. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 3/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2019. (crt,Comeaux, M) Modified on 4/9/2019 to correct file date and hearing judge (Whidden, C). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet Docs 100-198)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet Docs 1-99)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Doc 150 Part 7 of 12, #2 BK Doc 150 Part 8 of 12, #3 BK Doc 150 Part 9 of 12, #4 BK Doc 150 Part 10 of 12, #5 BK Doc 150 Part 11 of 12, #6 BK Doc 150 Part 12 of 12)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Doc 150 Part 1 of 12, #2 BK Doc 150 Part 2 of 12, #3 BK Doc 150 Part 3 of 12, #4 BK Doc 150 Part 4 of 12, #5 BK Doc 150 Part 5 of 12, #6 BK Doc 150 Part 6 of 12)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 126,127,137,138,139,153,164, #2 BK Doc 112 Part 1 of 6, #3 BK Doc 112 Part 2 of 6, #4 BK Doc 112 Part 3 of 6, #5 BK Doc 112 Part 4 of 6, #6 BK Doc 112 Part 5 of 6, #7 BK Doc 112 Part 6 of 6)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BANKRUPTCY DESIGNATION of Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, with no transcript requested by Mr Mason L L C (Attachments: #1 BK Docs 29,30,34,43,48,52,93,116, #2 Bk Doc 94, #3 BK Doc 114,115)(crt,Comeaux, M) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge Robert R Summerhays no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 3/22/2019. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT from Order dated 3/7/19 signed by Bankruptcy Judge John W Kolwe filed by Mr Mason LLC. (Attachments: #1 BK Order Appealed, #2 BK Notice of filing Notice of Appeal, #3 BK Docket Sheet)(crt,Doucet, M) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie A. Collins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Scott Draper