This case was last updated from PACER on 01/22/2021 at 08:16:17 (UTC).

MPower Inc v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 MPower Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01183

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MPower Inc

Defendant

Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Engel

Attorney at Mansell Engel & Cole PC

204 N Robinson, 21St Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7201

Defendant Attorneys

Casper J den Harder

Attorney at Richards & Connor

525 S Main St, 12Th Fl, Parkecentre Building

Tulsa, OK 74103-4509

Phil R Richards

Attorney at Richards & Connor

525 S Main St, Suite 1250

Tulsa, OK 74103

Ethan M Sneed

Attorney at Richards & Connor

525 S Main St, 12Th Fl, Parkecentre Building

Tulsa, OK 74103-4509

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by MPower Inc . (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed by MPower Inc.(Engel, Adam) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company . (den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before December 11, 2020. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/30/20. (md) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Ethan M Sneed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Sneed, Ethan) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Phil R Richards on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Richards, Phil) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

(#3) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Casper J den Harder on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Entries of Appearance

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons OID Transmittal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5157 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons OID Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Entries of Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by MPower Inc . (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed by MPower Inc.(Engel, Adam) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company . (den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before December 11, 2020. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/30/20. (md) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Ethan M Sneed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Sneed, Ethan) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Phil R Richards on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Richards, Phil) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Casper J den Harder on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (den Harder, Casper) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3400322. (Richards, Phil) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5157 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons OID Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Entries of Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less