This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:24:20 (UTC).

Moyer v. Alaskan Leader Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Moyer filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Alaskan Leader Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary Alice Theiler and Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01995

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mary Alice Theiler

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacob Moyer

Defendants

Bristol Bay Economic Development Corp.

Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC

Alaskan Leader Group LLC

Bristol Bay Economic Development Corp

Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Stephen Stacey

Attorney at STACEY & JACOBSEN LLP

4039 21St Ave W, Ste 401

Seattle, WA 98199

Defendant Attorneys

Colin Jeffrey Folawn

Attorney at SCHWABE WILLIAMSON & WYATT (SEA)

1420 5Th Ave, Ste 3400

Seattle, WA 98101-2339

Bert W. Markovich

Attorney at SCHWABE WILLIAMSON & WYATT (SEA)

1420 5Th Ave, Ste 3400

Seattle, WA 98101-2339

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 8. Filed by Plaintiff Jacob Moyer.(Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/4/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/18/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2020. (KMP) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (KMP) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC.(Folawn, Colin) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC (Folawn, Colin) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/14/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bert W. Markovich on behalf of Defendants Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC. (Markovich, Bert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Colin Jeffrey Folawn on behalf of Defendants Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC. (Folawn, Colin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Colin Folawn, on behalf of defendants, on 12/17/2019. (Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Joseph Stephen Stacey for Plaintiff Jacob Moyer from 12/20/2019-01/03/2020. (Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

4 #1

Summons BLF

#4

(#4) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons BLF)(TF) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

3 #2

Summons BLF

3 #1

Summons Amended ALF

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jacob Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended ALF, #2 Summons BLF)(Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Alaskan Leader Group LLC, Bristol Bay Economic Development Corp (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (SNP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 8. Filed by Plaintiff Jacob Moyer.(Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/4/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/18/2020, Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2020. (KMP) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik and referred to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (KMP) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC.(Folawn, Colin) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC (Folawn, Colin) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/14/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bert W. Markovich on behalf of Defendants Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC. (Markovich, Bert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Colin Jeffrey Folawn on behalf of Defendants Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC. (Folawn, Colin) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Colin Folawn, on behalf of defendants, on 12/17/2019. (Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Joseph Stephen Stacey for Plaintiff Jacob Moyer from 12/20/2019-01/03/2020. (Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Bristol Leader Fisheries LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons BLF)(TF) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jacob Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended ALF, #2 Summons BLF)(Stacey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Alaskan Leader Group LLC, Bristol Bay Economic Development Corp (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (SNP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketHon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SNP) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Alaskan Leader Fisheries LLC, Alaskan Leader Group LLC, Bristol Bay Economic Development Corp. with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jacob Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Summons ALF, #2 Summons ALG, #3 Summons BBEDC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stacey, Joseph) (Prepayment Waived) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.