This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2022 at 09:18:34 (UTC).

Moxchange LLC v. Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Moxchange LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02141

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moxchange LLC

Defendant

Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David R Bennett

Attorney at DIRECTION IP LAW

2620 N Burling St, Po Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60614

Defendant Attorney

Charles D Wineland, III

Attorney at ZMODO TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION LIMITED

1401 Interstate Drive

Champaign, IL 61822

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,233,664

1 #2

Exhibit B - excerpt from prosecution history of U.S. Patent No. 7,233,664

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons for Issuance

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David R Bennett on behalf of Moxchange LLC (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Moxchange LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent by Moxchange LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited.(Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Charles D Wineland, III on behalf of Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited (Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited. (Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement (Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/1/2022. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 9:45 AM by personal appearance in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (BMG) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Moxchange LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/24/2022. The Court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 30, 2022. The Court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agree Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #12 . See written Order for deadlines.(BMG) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/24/2022. The Court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 30, 2022. The Court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agree Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #12 . See written Order for deadlines.(BMG) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Moxchange LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/1/2022. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 9:45 AM by personal appearance in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (BMG) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement (Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited. (Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Charles D Wineland, III on behalf of Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited (Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited.(Wineland, Charles) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moxchange LLC. Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited and mailed to plaintiff's attorney for service. (SKR) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent by Moxchange LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Moxchange LLC. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David R Bennett on behalf of Moxchange LLC (Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3972748.), filed by Moxchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,233,664, #2 Exhibit B - excerpt from prosecution history of U.S. Patent No. 7,233,664, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons for Issuance)(Bennett, David) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zmodo Technology Corporation Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Moxchange LLC is a litigant