This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 16:45:03 (UTC).

Moxchange LLC v. Foscam, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Moxchange LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Foscam, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01720

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moxchange LLC

Defendant

Foscam, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni Wang Massand PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Ln, Ste 500

Dallas, TX 75231

David R Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

Po Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60617-0184

Defendant Attorney

Yanpin Yang

Attorney at Law Office of Yang and Associates

6689 W Sam Houston Pkwy, Ste 302

Houston, TX 77072

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Foscam, Inc. 8/18/2021.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Foscam, Inc. filed by Moxchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Foscam, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2021. (Yang, Yanpin) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for David R Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Moxchange LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2021. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Foscam, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Foscam, Inc., filed.(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) by Moxchange LLC, filed. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Moxchange LLC, filed.(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Foscam, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26493920) filed by Moxchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Foscam, Inc. 8/18/2021.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Foscam, Inc. filed by Moxchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Foscam, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2021. (Yang, Yanpin) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for David R Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for David R. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Moxchange LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2021. (Bennett, David) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Foscam, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DesireeSillas, 4) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Foscam, Inc., filed.(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) by Moxchange LLC, filed. (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Moxchange LLC, filed.(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Foscam, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26493920) filed by Moxchange LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Moxchange LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hao Ni

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Bennett