This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 07:15:04 (UTC).

Moxchange LLC v. Axis Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Moxchange LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Axis Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06352

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moxchange LLC

Defendant

Axis Communications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Randolph Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184, 2620 N. Burling St.,

Chicago, IL 60614

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony S. Volpe

Attorney at Volpe and Koenig, P.C.

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael F. Snyder

Attorney at Volpe and Koenig, P.C.

30 South 17Th Street, Suite 1800

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Eugene Edward Murphy, Jr.

Attorney at Murphy Law Group, LLC

161 N. Clark St., Suite 2550

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Patent conference held off the record on 12/16/2020 and is continued to 1/27/2021 at 2:00 p.m. The conference will proceed by telephone. Parties are to dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By agreement of the parties, a Patent Conference is set for 12/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m. The conference will proceed by telephone. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #10 , #11 are granted. Attorneys Michael F. Snyder and Anthony S. Volpe for Axis Communications, Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17677683. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17677596. (Volpe, Anthony) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint by December 30, 2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

8 #1

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing

#8

(#8) MOTION by Defendant Axis Communications, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Axis Communications, Inc. by Eugene Edward Murphy, Jr (Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#6

(#6) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Local Rules of course apply to all patent cases filed in this District. It is Judge Durkin's practice, however, to hold an informal, off the record meeting with the attorneys for the parties as soon as possible after all parties have counsel who have filed appearances. All discussions at the meeting will be inadmissible in any later proceeding under Federal Rule of Evidence 408. The purpose of the meeting is to see whether an early resolution of the case, or a narrowing or prioritizing of the contested issues can occur before any scheduling order is prepared by the parties. No position papers or other briefs should be filed in advance of the meeting, which will last an hour or less. Counsel shall collaborate in selecting a prompt date and email Judge Durkin's courtroom deputy, Emily Wall at emily_wall@ilnd.uscourts.gov to schedule. No answer to the complaint is required until after this meeting, which is intended to minimize the costs of this uniquely expensive kind of litigation. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Moxchange LLC (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Moxchange LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit G - Notice of Allowability, Appl. No. 10/633,918

1 #7

Exhibit F - Ex Parte Hamdy Soliman, Appellant's Appeal Brief, Appl. No. 10/

1 #6

Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 7,376,232

1 #3

Exhibit B - Ex Parte Soliman, decision of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, App

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Patent conference held off the record on 12/16/2020 and is continued to 1/27/2021 at 2:00 p.m. The conference will proceed by telephone. Parties are to dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By agreement of the parties, a Patent Conference is set for 12/16/2020 at 10:00 a.m. The conference will proceed by telephone. To join the telephone conference, dial 877-402-9757, Access Code 4410831. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motions to appear pro hac vice #10 , #11 are granted. Attorneys Michael F. Snyder and Anthony S. Volpe for Axis Communications, Inc. added. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17677683. (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17677596. (Volpe, Anthony) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint by December 30, 2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Axis Communications, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Axis Communications, Inc. by Eugene Edward Murphy, Jr (Murphy, Eugene) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Axis Communications, Inc. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: The Local Rules of course apply to all patent cases filed in this District. It is Judge Durkin's practice, however, to hold an informal, off the record meeting with the attorneys for the parties as soon as possible after all parties have counsel who have filed appearances. All discussions at the meeting will be inadmissible in any later proceeding under Federal Rule of Evidence 408. The purpose of the meeting is to see whether an early resolution of the case, or a narrowing or prioritizing of the contested issues can occur before any scheduling order is prepared by the parties. No position papers or other briefs should be filed in advance of the meeting, which will last an hour or less. Counsel shall collaborate in selecting a prompt date and email Judge Durkin's courtroom deputy, Emily Wall at emily_wall@ilnd.uscourts.gov to schedule. No answer to the complaint is required until after this meeting, which is intended to minimize the costs of this uniquely expensive kind of litigation. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Moxchange LLC (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Moxchange LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Moxchange LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17582291. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,860,254, #3 Exhibit B - Ex Parte Soliman, decision of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Appl. No. 10/387,711, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 7,233,664, #5 Exhibit D - Office Action re Appl. No. 10/448,989, #6 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 7,376,232, #7 Exhibit F - Ex Parte Hamdy Soliman, Appellant's Appeal Brief, Appl. No. 10/633,918, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Allowability, Appl. No. 10/633,918)(Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less