Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2021 at 07:28:26 (UTC).

Mowen v. Doe et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Mowen filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04092

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Micah Mowen

Galesburg, IL 61401

Defendants

Medical Staff Member

John Doe, I

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Letter to the Court from Micah Mowen (RES) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#1

(#1) Letter from Micah Mowen. (KB) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to the Court from Micah Mowen (RES) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketTEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/18/2021. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $402 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. (KB) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 322 16th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KB) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Letter from Micah Mowen. (KB) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF is a litigant