This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2021 at 07:58:56 (UTC).

Mouton v. Halliburton Company

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Mouton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Halliburton Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin L.C. Feldman and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joanna R Mouton

Houma, LA 70364

Defendants

Halliburton Company

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Richard G. Duplantier, Jr.

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St. Suite 4040

New Orleans, LA 70139

Christopher Ashley Meeks

Attorney at Christopher Meeks

701 Poydras Street, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #4 Request for Jury Demand. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 6/25/2021. (sa) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#4

(#4) **DEFICIENT** Request for Jury Demand by Joanna R Mouton. (sa) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/11/2021.(ko) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd Judicial District Court, Parish of Terrebonne, case number 190264 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8852710) filed by Halliburton Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney Richard G. Duplantier, Jr added to party Halliburton Company(pty:dft).(Duplantier, Richard) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #4 Request for Jury Demand. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 6/25/2021. (sa) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **DEFICIENT** Request for Jury Demand by Joanna R Mouton. (sa) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/11/2021.(ko) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd Judicial District Court, Parish of Terrebonne, case number 190264 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8852710) filed by Halliburton Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney Richard G. Duplantier, Jr added to party Halliburton Company(pty:dft).(Duplantier, Richard) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A Meeks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard G. Duplantier, Jr.