This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2020 at 09:06:21 (UTC).

Mousavi v. Life Time Fitness Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Mousavi filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Life Time Fitness Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03691

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Allen Mousavi

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Life Time Fitness Inc

LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC.

Life Time, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David Kent Mestemaker

Attorney at Mestemaker Straub

3100 Timmons Lane, Suite 455

Houston, TX 77027

Shawn E Ozlat

Attorney at Owsley & Associates

1640 Richmond Ave

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Ryan Grant Cole

Attorney at Spencer Fane, LLP

5700 Granite Parkway, Suite 650

Dallas, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit A

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Mestemaker on behalf of Allen Mousavi, filed. (Mestemaker, David) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED ANSWER to, COUNTERCLAIM against Allen Mousavi by LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., Life Time, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cole, Ryan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., Life Time Fitness Inc, filed.(Cole, Ryan) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 268th District Court, Fort Bend County, case number 20-DCV-277146 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25419416) filed by Life Time Fitness Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cole, Ryan) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LTF Club Operations Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LTF CLUB OPERATIONS COMPANY, INC., dba Life Time Fitness, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan G Cole