This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2020 at 10:49:17 (UTC).

Moure et al v. Liquid Captial Exchange Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 Moure filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Liquid Captial Exchange Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and Liam O'Grady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00743

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure

Alexandria, VA 22311

Comvaltech Corp. of Puerto Rico

Defendants

Pfizer Global Manufacturing Puerto Rico

Hector Rafael Figueroa Fernandez

Pfizer Industry Association Puerto Rico

First Bank of Puerto Rico

Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Company Inc.

Wyeth-Whitehall Parmaceuticals Inc.

Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC

Pfizer Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Garrington Group LTD

Lilly Del Caribe Inc.

Liquid Captial Exchange Inc.

Scotia Bank of Puerto Rico

General Attorney of the United State Department of Justice

Pfizer Global Manufacturing

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued, via SPS, as to All Defendants. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14683085970 (dvanm, ) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification by Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Consent to Magistrate Judge by Comvaltech Corp. of Puerto Rico, Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Comvaltech Corp. of Puerto Rico, Edwin Antonio Algarin Moure. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pfizer Global Manufacturing is a litigant

Latest cases where ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITEDSTATES is a litigant