This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:40:06 (UTC).

MountainOne Bank v. United States Fire Insurance Co.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MountainOne Bank filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United States Fire Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine A. Robertson and Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-30001

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katherine A. Robertson

Presiding Judge

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MountainOne Bank

Defendant

United States Fire Insurance Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Grannon Fox

Attorney at Nutter McClennen and Fish LLP

155 Seaport Blvd

Boston, MA 02210

Liam T. O'Connell

Attorney at Nutter McClennen & Fish LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210

Natalie M. Cappellazzo

Attorney at Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210-2604

Defendant Attorneys

Peter G. Hermes

Attorney at Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing

265 Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Patrick T. Ryan

Attorney at Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing

265 Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Patrick Dowdle

Attorney at Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan LLP

200 Summmit Lake Drive

Valhalla, NY 10595

Scott A. Schechter

Attorney at Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan

99 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

8 #5

Certificate of Service

#21

(#21) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (O'Connell, Liam) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie M. Cappellazzo on behalf of MountainOne Bank (Cappellazzo, Natalie) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

8 #1

Civil Action Cover Sheet

1 #3

Case Category Form

8 #4

Notice of Filing the Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Fire Insurance Co.. (Hermes, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#24

(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MountainOne Bank. (Cappellazzo, Natalie) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#8

(#8) STATE COURT Record All Parties.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Tracking Order, #4 Notice of Filing the Notice of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#7) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendant's Assented to #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Fire Insurance Co. answer due 1/17/2020. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Schechter, Scott) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Ryan on behalf of United States Fire Insurance Co. (Ryan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#26

(#26) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions for Leave to Amend the pleadings to add parties, claims, or defenses due by 7/31/2020. Non-Expert Discovery to be completed y 12/1/2020. Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020 02:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2021. Responses due by 2/19/2021. Replies, if any, due by 3/5/2021. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

8 #2

Complaint

#20

(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MountainOne Bank. (O'Connell, Liam) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Fire Insurance Co. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8038773 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Category Form)(Hermes, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions for Leave to Amend the pleadings to add parties, claims, or defenses due by 7/31/2020. Non-Expert Discovery to be completed y 12/1/2020. Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2020 02:00 PM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2021. Responses due by 2/19/2021. Replies, if any, due by 3/5/2021. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#25) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: Scheduling Conference held on 3/2/2020. Attorneys Present: Liam T. O'Connell and Scott A. Schechter. Colloquy re: status of the case. A schedule was established. Scheduling order to issue. If the parties would like to participate in court-sponsored mediation, a joint motion requesting an ADR conference should be filed. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Rivera, Melissa) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MountainOne Bank. (Cappellazzo, Natalie) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie M. Cappellazzo on behalf of MountainOne Bank (Cappellazzo, Natalie) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Schechter, Scott) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (O'Connell, Liam) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MountainOne Bank. (O'Connell, Liam) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#19) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson for full pretrial case management, not including dispositive motions, for a Rule 16 scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#18) Set/Reset Hearings: The 3/2/2020 Scheduling Conference WILL REMAIN BEFORE Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 10:00 AM in Hampshire Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. Joint Statement due by 2/24/2020. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 2/10/2020 to add to the text when the Joint Statement is due. (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott A. Schechter Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8071527 by United States Fire Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ryan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by United States Fire Insurance Co..(Ryan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT Record All Parties.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Tracking Order, #4 Notice of Filing the Notice of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ryan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting the Defendant's Assented to #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Fire Insurance Co. answer due 1/17/2020. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to January 17, 2020 to File Answer by United States Fire Insurance Co..(Ryan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) Remark: Emailed A Certified copy of the Notice of Removal today to Defendants Counsel for service on the State Court in order to obtain the certified State Court record. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Ryan on behalf of United States Fire Insurance Co. (Ryan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Fire Insurance Co.. (Hermes, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Fire Insurance Co. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8038773 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Category Form)(Hermes, Peter) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.