This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:43:39 (UTC).

Mountain v. Big Lots Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Mountain filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Big Lots Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Seibel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-04575

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Seibel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dwayne Mountain

Defendant

Big Lots Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erica Sanders

Attorney at Phillips & Associates, PLLC

50 Main Street

White Plains, NY 10606

Parisis G. Filippatos

Attorney at Phillips & Associates, PLLC

45 Broadway, Ste. 620

New York, NY 10006

Defendant Attorney

Bradley J Levien

Attorney at Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ladva & Meyers, LLP(NYC)

17 West John Street, Suite 200

Hicksville, NY 11801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 53664/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16908694).Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit -1 Complaint, #3 Exhibit -2 Proof of Service of Complaint, #4 Exhibit -3 Answer, #5 Exhibit -4 Demand for Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit -5 Notice to Take Deposition, #7 Exhibit -6 Request for Preliminary Conference, #8 Exhibit -7 Statement of Damages, #9 Exhibit -8 Request for Judicial Intervention)(Levien, Bradley) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #9

Exhibit -8 Request for Judicial Intervention

1 #8

Exhibit -7 Statement of Damages

1 #7

Exhibit -6 Request for Preliminary Conference

1 #6

Exhibit -5 Notice to Take Deposition

1 #5

Exhibit -4 Demand for Statement of Damages

1 #4

Exhibit -3 Answer

1 #2

Exhibit -1 Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit -2 Proof of Service of Complaint

#14

(#14) CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional patties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any pre-motion conference in connection with a motion to amend or join additional parties must be requested by 7/20/2019. Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Deposition due by 9/13/2019. Requests to Admit, if any, are to be served by 9/18/2019. Any further interrogatories are to be served by 9/18/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/18/2019. Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. The parties do not consent to a magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/20/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The motion of Cory D. Catignani, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/18/2019) (mro) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Stale Certificate of Good Standing appended to Pro Hac Vice Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Bradley Levien dated June 18, 2019. Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc..(Levien, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#11

(#11) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Dwayne Mountain. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

9 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Applicant Cory D. Catignani

#9

(#9) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Applicant Cory D. Catignani, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Applicant Cory D. Catignani, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Levien, Bradley) Modified on 6/18/2019 (bcu). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

9 #3

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit of Applicant Cory D. Catignani

8 #4

Affidavit Proof of service

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Initial Conference held on 6/20/2019. Defendant's counsel (Cory Catignani, Esq.) appears telephonically. Deposition cutoff is September 13, 2019. Requests to admit and follow-up interrogatories cutoff is September 18, 2019. Case Management Plan signed. Pre-motion letter(s) to be submitted by October 15, 2019; opposition due October 22, 2019. See transcript. (Status Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel). (Court Reporter Angela O'Donnell) (wc) Modified on 6/21/2019 (wc). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional patties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any pre-motion conference in connection with a motion to amend or join additional parties must be requested by 7/20/2019. Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Deposition due by 9/13/2019. Requests to Admit, if any, are to be served by 9/18/2019. Any further interrogatories are to be served by 9/18/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/18/2019. Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. The parties do not consent to a magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/20/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: The motion of Cory D. Catignani, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/18/2019) (mro) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: I will grant the pro hac vice motion separately. Mr. Catignani may listen in the conference by phone. He should contact my courtroom deputy, Walter Clark (914-390-4077 or walter_clark@nysd.uscourts.gov) to make arrangements. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Dwayne Mountain. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Stale Certificate of Good Standing appended to Pro Hac Vice Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Bradley Levien dated June 18, 2019. Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc..(Levien, Bradley) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 AMENDED MOTION for Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Ohio;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION for Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Applicant Cory D. Catignani, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Applicant Cory D. Catignani, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Levien, Bradley) Modified on 6/18/2019 (bcu). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17080374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Motion for pro hac vice is missing. Please file all the proper documents for a Motion for Pro Hac Vice.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Cory D. Catignani to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17080374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, by Applicant, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Proof of service)(Levien, Bradley) Modified on 6/14/2019 (bcu). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Bradley J Levien to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil cover sheet was not signed. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bradley J Levien. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $120,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica Sanders on behalf of Dwayne Mountain. (Sanders, Erica) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Parisis G. Filippatos on behalf of Dwayne Mountain. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Big Lots, Inc. for Big Lots Stores, Inc.. Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc..(Levien, Bradley) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Levien, Bradley) Modified on 5/20/2019 (pc). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 53664/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16908694).Document filed by Big Lots Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit -1 Complaint, #3 Exhibit -2 Proof of Service of Complaint, #4 Exhibit -3 Answer, #5 Exhibit -4 Demand for Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit -5 Notice to Take Deposition, #7 Exhibit -6 Request for Preliminary Conference, #8 Exhibit -7 Statement of Damages, #9 Exhibit -8 Request for Judicial Intervention)(Levien, Bradley) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.