This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2020 at 08:37:14 (UTC).

Mounce v. Allergan Sales, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Mounce filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Allergan Sales, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel B. Toomey and Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00916

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristina Rena Mounce

Defendants

Allergan Sales, LLC

Ricardo E Mojica

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Shakib

Attorney at Terrell Hogan, PA

8Th Floor, 233 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorneys

Brian T. Guthrie

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

Jennifer M. Voss

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

100 N Tampa St Ste 2900

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

Rebecca Marie Harris

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

100 N. Tampa St., Ste. 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay to extent stated in Donato (see order for directions to the Clerk and parties). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/27/2020. (SRW) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION by Kristina Rena Mounce. (Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC, Ricardo E Mojica, originally filed in the Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County on 7/21/20 case #2020-CA-4043 filed by Kristina Rena Mounce.(KKH) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allergan Sales, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allergan, Inc., Corporate Parent AbbVie, Inc., Corporate Parent Allergan Limited for Allergan Sales, LLC.. (Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Guthrie, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, case number 2020-CA-004043 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17178076 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guthrie, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCase Stayed. (KKH) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay to extent stated in Donato (see order for directions to the Clerk and parties). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/27/2020. (SRW) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION by Kristina Rena Mounce. (Shakib, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC, Ricardo E Mojica, originally filed in the Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County on 7/21/20 case #2020-CA-4043 filed by Kristina Rena Mounce.(KKH) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Allergan Sales, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allergan, Inc., Corporate Parent AbbVie, Inc., Corporate Parent Allergan Limited for Allergan Sales, LLC.. (Voss, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Guthrie, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:20-cv-916-J-32JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, case number 2020-CA-004043 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17178076 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guthrie, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allergan Sales, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Marie Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN TERRY GUTHRIE