This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:18:08 (UTC).

MOULTON v. BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 MOULTON filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Jerome B. Simandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06327

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Jerome B. Simandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENICE MOULTON

Defendants

BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC.

JOHN DOES 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAAKOV SAKS

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

285 Passaic Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GENICE MOULTON. BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC., JOHN DOES 1-25 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9433490) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GENICE MOULTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by GENICE MOULTON. BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Judge Jerome B. Simandle and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BUSINESS REVENUE SYSTEMS, INC., JOHN DOES 1-25 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9433490) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GENICE MOULTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.