This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:58:59 (UTC).

Moturi v. ICE Field Office Director

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Moturi filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against ICE Field Office Director. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A Tsuchida and Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02023

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brian A Tsuchida

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sudheer Rao Moturi

Tacoma, WA 98421-1615

Respondent

ICE Field Office Director

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

US Attorney Habeas

Raya Jarawan

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (BOX 878)

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Patricia D Gugin

Attorney at US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (TACOMA)

1201 Pacific Ave, Ste 700

Tacoma, WA 98402

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Petitioner via USPS)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #2

Prison Trust Account

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). On or before January 20, 2020, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on February 14, 2020 Petitioner may file and serve a response on or before February10, 2020 and respondent(s) may file and serve a reply on or before the noting date. (cc: petitioner)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

1 #1

PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

#8

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Tsuchida, filed by Sudheer Rao Moturi. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Prison Trust Account)(ST) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Sudheer Rao Moturi. Noting Date 2/14/2020, (TH) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNoting Date Reset re Respondent's #9 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Petition : Noting Date 2/14/2020, per direction of chambers and per LRC 7(d)(3). (PM) cc: NEF sent to Petitioner via USPS (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Habeas Petition, filed by Respondent ICE Field Office Director. Noting Date 1/20/2020 2/14/2020, (Jarawan, Raya) Modified on 1/21/2020 per direction of chambers (PM). (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Raya Jarawan on behalf of Respondent ICE Field Office Director. (Jarawan, Raya) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia D Gugin on behalf of Respondent ICE Field Office Director. (Gugin, Patricia) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). On or before January 20, 2020, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on February 14, 2020 Petitioner may file and serve a response on or before February10, 2020 and respondent(s) may file and serve a reply on or before the noting date. (cc: petitioner)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Sudheer Rao Moturi.(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Petitioner via USPS)(SG) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS) (ST) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Tsuchida, filed by Sudheer Rao Moturi. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Prison Trust Account)(ST) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.