Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 17:34:45 (UTC).

Mott v. Goncalves et. al.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Mott filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Goncalves. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arlene R. Lindsay and Joan M. Azrack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01949

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geoffrey T. Mott

Defendants

Jose Goncalves

Goncalves Construction Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Scott Kazin

Attorney at Stagg Wabnik Law Group LLP

401 Franklin Avenue, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

Jack M. Martins

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 901

Uniondale, NY 11553

Daniel Scott Hallak

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

The Omni 333 Earle Ovington Blvd, Suite 901

Uniondale, NY 11553

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPLY in Opposition re #11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Letter to Judge Azrack: Request for One Week Extension to Respond to Defendants' Letter filed by Geoffrey T. Mott. (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#11

(#11) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation. (Hallak, Daniel) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#10

(#10) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation. (Hallak, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Scott Hallak on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Hallak, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack M. Martins on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Martins, Jack) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoffrey T. Mott. Jose Goncalves served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoffrey T. Mott. Goncalves Construction Corporation served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. by Geoffrey T. Mott (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14362629 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Geoffrey T. Mott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kazin, Andrew) Modified on 4/13/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER re #12 Reply in Opposition filed by Geoffrey T. Mott. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' pre-motion conference letter by June 18, 2021. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/8/2021. (Terranova, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY in Opposition re #11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Letter to Judge Azrack: Request for One Week Extension to Respond to Defendants' Letter filed by Geoffrey T. Mott. (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation. (Hallak, Daniel) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Jose Goncalves and Goncalves Construction Corporation to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including June 7, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 5/18/2021. (Jacobwitz, Beth) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation. (Hallak, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Scott Hallak on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Hallak, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack M. Martins on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Martins, Jack) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoffrey T. Mott. Jose Goncalves served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geoffrey T. Mott. Goncalves Construction Corporation served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation. (Ortiz, Grisel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. by Geoffrey T. Mott (Kazin, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketYour Proposed Summons was not issued for the following reason: The section that reads "The answer or motion must be served on Plaintiff or Plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" has not been completed. Please correct the Proposed Summons and resubmit using the event Other Filings - Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jose Goncalves, Goncalves Construction Corporation filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14362629 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Geoffrey T. Mott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kazin, Andrew) Modified on 4/13/2021 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less