This case was last updated from PACER on 11/07/2020 at 08:27:25 (UTC).

Motel Inn, LLC v. 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Motel Inn, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 9223-6678 Quebec Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08203

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Motel Inn, LLC

Defendants

Steven Clement

Guillaume Langevin

9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream)

9223-6678 Quebec, Inc. a Canadian corporation situated in Quebec doing business as Nomad Airstream also known as Custom Airstream

Custom Airstream

Does 1-25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chase Wesley Martin

Attorney at Adamski Moroski Madden Cumberland & Green

P.O. Box 3835

San Luis Obispo, CA 93403-3835

Linda Somers Smith

Attorney at Asamski Moroski Madden Cumberland and Green LLP

P O Box 3835

San Luis Obispo, CA 93403-3835

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C Wolf

Attorney at Turner Freidman Morris and Cohan LLP

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 510

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Lauren Kennedy VanDenburg

Attorney at Turner Freidman Morris and Cohan LLP

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 510

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Luis Obispo Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Luis Obispo Superior Court. (yl) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants have failed to satisfy their burden of showing that diversity jurisdiction exists over this action. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to San Luis Obispo County Superior Court, Case No. 20CV-0351, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. (See minutes for further details) remanding case to San Luis Obispo County Superior Court, Case number 20CV-0351 (yl) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream) identifying 9223-6678 Quebec Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream), Steven Clement, Guillaume Langevin. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B State Articles of Incorporation

1 #1

Exhibit A State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Luis Obispo Superior Court, case number 20CV-0351 Receipt No: ACACDC-27984611 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Guillaume Langevin, Steven Clement, 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Articles of Incorporation) (Attorney Matthew C Wolf added to party 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream)(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew C Wolf added to party Steven Clement(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew C Wolf added to party Guillaume Langevin(pty:dft))(Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Luis Obispo Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Luis Obispo Superior Court. (yl) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Percy Anderson: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants have failed to satisfy their burden of showing that diversity jurisdiction exists over this action. Accordingly, this action is hereby remanded to San Luis Obispo County Superior Court, Case No. 20CV-0351, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). IT IS SO ORDERED. (See minutes for further details) remanding case to San Luis Obispo County Superior Court, Case number 20CV-0351 (yl) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants 9223-6678 Quebec, Inc., Steven Clement, Does, Guillaume Langevin, filed by plaintiff Motel Inn, LLC. (filed in state court 7/14/20,submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream) identifying 9223-6678 Quebec Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream), Steven Clement, Guillaume Langevin. (Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Luis Obispo Superior Court, case number 20CV-0351 Receipt No: ACACDC-27984611 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Guillaume Langevin, Steven Clement, 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Articles of Incorporation) (Attorney Matthew C Wolf added to party 9223-6678 Quebec Inc., dba Nomad Airstream (aka Custom Airstream)(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew C Wolf added to party Steven Clement(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew C Wolf added to party Guillaume Langevin(pty:dft))(Wolf, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less